This case was last updated from PACER on 04/25/2020 at 16:08:36 (UTC).

Sharp et al v. Becerra et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Sharp filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Becerra. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Allison Claire and Morrison C. England, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02317

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Allison Claire

Presiding Judge

Morrison C. England, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Ryan Gilardy

Second Amendment Foundation

Harry Sharp

Firearms Policy Foundation

The Calguns Foundation

David Ajirogi

Firearms Policy Coalition

Darin Prince

David Kuen

Todd Feltman

Madison Society Foundation

Terry Jahraus

Defendants

Xavier Becerra

Second Amendment Foundation

California Department of Justice

Brent E. Orick

Joe Dominic

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe

Attorney at The DiGuiseppe Law Firm, P.C.

2 North Front Street, 5Th Floor

Wilmington, NC 28401

George M. Lee

Attorney at Seiler Epstein LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 1600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Bradley A. Benbrook

Attorney at Benbrook Law Group

400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2530

Sacramento, CA 95814

Nancy Jean Doig

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Enrique Antonio Monagas

Attorney at Sklar Kirsh, LLP

1880 Century Park East, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

John William Killeen

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125, P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe. (DiGuiseppe, Raymond) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#28

(#28) ANSWER by Xavier Becerra, California Department of Justice, Joe Dominic, Brent E. Orick.(Killeen, John) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#27

(#27) STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint by Xavier Becerra, California Department of Justice, Joe Dominic, Brent E. Orick. (Killeen, John) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#26

(#26) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/25/2019 DENYING #14 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Reader, L) Modified on 6/26/2019 (Reader, L). (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by George M. Lee. (Lee, George) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#24

(#24) PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/07/19. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

14 #2

Proposed Order

14 #1

Memorandum

#14

(#20) REPLY by Xavier Becerra, California Department of Justice, Joe Dominic, Brent E. Orick to RESPONSE to #14 Motion to Dismiss. (Killeen, John) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

2 #2

VDRP

1 #7

Proof of Service

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Shasta Superior Court, case number 190350 by Respondents. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7830837) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proof of Service)(Doig, Nancy) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe. (DiGuiseppe, Raymond) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ANSWER by Xavier Becerra, California Department of Justice, Joe Dominic, Brent E. Orick.(Killeen, John) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint by Xavier Becerra, California Department of Justice, Joe Dominic, Brent E. Orick. (Killeen, John) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/25/2019 DENYING #14 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Reader, L) Modified on 6/26/2019 (Reader, L). (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by George M. Lee. (Lee, George) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/07/19. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) STIPULATION and PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Xavier Becerra, California Department of Justice, Joe Dominic, Brent E. Orick. (Killeen, John) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/27/19 ADOPTING the Parties' #21 Joint Rule 26(F) Report and Discovery Plan. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by David Ajirogi et al. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, George) Modified on 1/30/2019 (Coll, A). (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) REPLY by Xavier Becerra, California Department of Justice, Joe Dominic, Brent E. Orick to RESPONSE to #14 Motion to Dismiss. (Killeen, John) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SECOND AMENDED PETITION against All Defendants by Firearms Policy Foundation, Ryan Gilardy, Second Amendment Foundation, David Ajirogi, Harry Sharp, The Calguns Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Benbrook, Bradley) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Bradley A. Benbrook for: David Ajirogi, Firearms Policy Coalition, Firearms Policy Foundation, Ryan Gilardy, Second Amendment Foundation, Harry Sharp, and The Calguns Foundation. (Benbrook, Bradley) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 09/17/18 EXTENDING Respondent's date to answer to 09/21/18; petitioners may file a Second Amended Complaint by 09/21/18. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint by David Ajirogi, Firearms Policy Coalition, Firearms Policy Foundation, Ryan Gilardy, Harry Sharp, The Calguns Foundation. (Lee, George) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiffs David Ajirogi, Firearms Policy Coalition, Firearms Policy Foundation, Ryan Gilardy, Harry Sharp, The Calguns Foundation. (Lee, George) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Xavier Becerra, California Department of Justice, Brent E. Orick. (Monagas, Enrique) Modified on 9/10/2018 (Zignago, K.). (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Xavier Becerra, California Department of Justice, Brent E. Orick. Attorney Monagas, Enrique Antonio added. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court)(Monagas, Enrique) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by David Ajirogi, Firearms Policy Coalition, Firearms Policy Foundation, Ryan Gilardy, Harry Sharp, The Calguns Foundation. (Lee, George) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Shasta Superior Court, case number 190350 by Respondents. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7830837) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proof of Service)(Doig, Nancy) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Department of Justice is a litigant

Latest cases where Second Amendment Foundation is a litigant