This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2018 at 13:48:40 (UTC).

Sharp Corporation v. Hisense Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2017 Sharp Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hisense Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-03341

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sharp Corporation

Defendants

Hisense USA Corporation

Hisense USA Multimedia R&D Center, Inc.

Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Limited

Hisense Electric Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Gordon Ball

Ira George Bibbero

Harold H. Davis, Jr.

Eric Marc George

Seth Alan Gold

Katherine Elaine Hertel

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Paul Lewis

 

Court Documents

#60

#71

#74

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) ORDER DISMISSING CASE re Notice 73 . Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/3/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 61 Motion to Amend/Correct or for reconsideration ; denying as moot 63 Ex parte Motion to Stay case pending decision; granting 19 Motion to Compel arbitration and stay proceedings; denying 20 Motion for Sanctions. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 35 Motion to Remand. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co. Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hisense Electric Co., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hisense USA Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Sharp Corporation is a litigant