This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/19/2018 at 07:00:38 (UTC).

Shannon Newby v. Punch TV Studios, INc.

Case Summary

On 03/20/2018 Shannon Newby filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Punch TV Studios, INc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Suzanne H. Segal and Dolly M. Gee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02272

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Suzanne H. Segal

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shannon Newby

Defendants

DOES 1-10, inclusive

Punch TV Studios, INc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lawrence J Zerner

Attorney at Larry Zerner Law Offices

1801 Century Park East Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorney

Robert K Lu

Attorney at Richie Litigation

633 West 5Th Street Us Bank Tower Suite 6780

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/1/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 6/15/2018 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti) (Entered: 04/25/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Answer of Punch TV Studios, Inc. filed by Attorney Punch TV Studios, INc..(Attorney Robert K Lu added to party Punch TV Studios, INc.(pty:dft))(Lu, Robert) (Entered: 04/25/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Punch TV Studios, Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (jtil) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shannon Newby. (Zerner, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Shannon Newby. (Zerner, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Shannon Newby. (Zerner, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shannon Newby, identifying Shannon Newby, Punch TV Studios, Inc.. (Zerner, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21440792 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Shannon Newby. (Attorney Lawrence J Zerner added to party Shannon Newby(pty:pla))(Zerner, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Punch TV Studios, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert K Lu