This case was last updated from PACER on 01/25/2019 at 07:33:53 (UTC).

Shannon et al v. CSX Transportation, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 Shannon filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CSX Transportation, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen K. Caldwell and Matthew A. Stinnett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00621

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

Referral Judge

Matthew A. Stinnett

 

Party Details

Defendant

CSX Transportation, Inc.

Executors

Harold Winnings

Jill Winings

Joy Shannon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Rodney Dale Payne

Attorney at Boehl, Stopher & Graves - Louisville KY

400 W. Market Street, 2300 Aegon Center

Louisville, KY 40202-3345

Executor Attorneys

Brent L. Caldwell

Attorney at Caldwell Law Firm, PLLC

153 Market Street

Lexington, KY 40507

Noel Embry Caldwell

Attorney at Todd & Todd PLLC

153 Market Street

Lexington, KY 40507

Donald R. Todd

Attorney at Todd & Todd PLLC

153 Market Street

Lexington, KY 40507

William R. Garmer

Attorney at Garmer & Prather, PLLC

141 N. Broadway

Lexington, KY 40507

T. Ryan Greer

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) PRETRIAL ORDER: 1. 21 days before PTC, counsel file: a. witness and exhibit lists; b. motions in limine; c. transcript of evidentiary depos to be used at trial; d. pretrial memo; e. proposed agreed jury instructions; f. proposed voir dire questions; 2. No later than 14 days before PTC, parties file: written obj to exhibit/witness lists; b. responses to motions in limine; c. responses to motions for ruling on obj made in evidentiary depo; 3. At PTC, parties prepared to: a. discuss and make stipulations of admissibility of exhibits, fact; b. disclose demonstrative or summary exhibits; c. display to court all exhibits intended to be used at trial, pre-marked; d. discuss possibility of settlement; e. advise Court of technological issues; 4. PTC shall be attended by all attorneys trying case along with parties and/or reps. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 1/10/19.(JLM)cc: COR (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. following deadlines observed: (a) exchange Rule 26(a)(1) info by 1/15/19; not to be filed in the record; (b) Amended Pleadings and Motion to Join Additional Parties due by 2/13/2020; (c) supplementation as required by Rule 26(e); (d) expert reports due from plt by 12/16/19; from dft by 1/30/2020, (e) Discovery due by 3/13/2020, (f) Dispositive Motions due by 4/20/2020. 2. No motions to compel filed unless counsel conferred as directed; 3. initial disclosures, interrogatories, answers thereto, requests for production or responses thereto, requests for admission or answers thereto, discovery depos shall not be filed; portions of discovery depos cited in motion or used at trial shall be filed. 4. No extensions of deadlines granted unless appropriate motion filed prior to expiration of deadline. 5. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 9/16/2020 at 11:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. 6. JURY TRIAL set for 10/19/2020 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell (7 days). Matter referred to Magistrate Judge Stinnett for managing discovery and pretrial scheduling issues and discovery disputes. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 1/10/19.(JLM)cc: COR,D,JC Modified text on 1/14/2019 (JLM). (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER: granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William R. Garmer terminated. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 1/10/19. (JLM)cc: COR (Entered: 01/10/2019)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Joy Shannon, Jill Winings, Harold Winnings (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garmer, William) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#6

(#6) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Payne, Rodney) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. Within 21 days parties shall meet to discuss prompt settlement or resolution of the case and to develop a discovery plan. 2. Within 10 days after the meeting the parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 11/27/2018.(JJ)cc: COR (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#3

(#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CSX Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Transportation, Inc. (JLM) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by CSX Transportation, Inc. (JLM) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

State Court Record Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-478. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4222023), filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLM) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PRETRIAL ORDER: 1. 21 days before PTC, counsel file: a. witness and exhibit lists; b. motions in limine; c. transcript of evidentiary depos to be used at trial; d. pretrial memo; e. proposed agreed jury instructions; f. proposed voir dire questions; 2. No later than 14 days before PTC, parties file: written obj to exhibit/witness lists; b. responses to motions in limine; c. responses to motions for ruling on obj made in evidentiary depo; 3. At PTC, parties prepared to: a. discuss and make stipulations of admissibility of exhibits, fact; b. disclose demonstrative or summary exhibits; c. display to court all exhibits intended to be used at trial, pre-marked; d. discuss possibility of settlement; e. advise Court of technological issues; 4. PTC shall be attended by all attorneys trying case along with parties and/or reps. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 1/10/19.(JLM)cc: COR (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. following deadlines observed: (a) exchange Rule 26(a)(1) info by 1/15/19; not to be filed in the record; (b) Amended Pleadings and Motion to Join Additional Parties due by 2/13/2020; (c) supplementation as required by Rule 26(e); (d) expert reports due from plt by 12/16/19; from dft by 1/30/2020, (e) Discovery due by 3/13/2020, (f) Dispositive Motions due by 4/20/2020. 2. No motions to compel filed unless counsel conferred as directed; 3. initial disclosures, interrogatories, answers thereto, requests for production or responses thereto, requests for admission or answers thereto, discovery depos shall not be filed; portions of discovery depos cited in motion or used at trial shall be filed. 4. No extensions of deadlines granted unless appropriate motion filed prior to expiration of deadline. 5. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 9/16/2020 at 11:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. 6. JURY TRIAL set for 10/19/2020 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell (7 days). Matter referred to Magistrate Judge Stinnett for managing discovery and pretrial scheduling issues and discovery disputes. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 1/10/19.(JLM)cc: COR,D,JC Modified text on 1/14/2019 (JLM). (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William R. Garmer terminated. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 1/10/19. (JLM)cc: COR (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Joy Shannon, Jill Winings, Harold Winnings (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garmer, William) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (STC) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Payne, Rodney) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. Within 21 days parties shall meet to discuss prompt settlement or resolution of the case and to develop a discovery plan. 2. Within 10 days after the meeting the parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 11/27/2018.(JJ)cc: COR (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: #1 Notice of Removal (JLM) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (JLM) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CSX Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Transportation, Inc. (JLM) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by CSX Transportation, Inc. (JLM) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-478. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4222023), filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLM) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less