This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/15/2019 at 16:53:41 (UTC).

Shah et al v. Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2016 Shah filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Theresa L Springmann, Michael G Gotsch, Sr and Philip P Simon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:16-CV-00815

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

Presiding Judges

Theresa L Springmann

Philip P Simon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shah

Local 1500 UFCW

Defendants

Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc

J.P. Morgan Securities LLC

Betsy J Bernard

GS LVB Co-Invest, L.P.

Private Equity Partners 2004 Direct Investment Fund L.P.

Goldman, Sachs & Co.

GS Capital Partners VI Fund, L.P.

Michael W Michelson

Jeffrey K Rhodes

Daniel P. Florin

GS Capital Partners VI Parallel, L.P.

Goldman Sachs BMET Investors Offshore Holdings, L.P.

TPG Partners V, L.P.

TPG LVB Co-Invest LLC

Private Equity Partners 2005 Direct L.P.

Private Equity Partners IX Direct L.P.

Gail K Boudreaux

PEP Bass Holdings, LLC

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Vahe Mesropyan PHV

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park E Ste 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Robert V Prongay PHV

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park E Ste 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Howard G Smith PHV

Attorney at Law Offices of Howard G Smith

3070 Bristol Pike Ste 112

Bensalem, PA 19020

Leanne H Solish PHV

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park E Ste 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Martin L Seidel PHV

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP

787 Seventh Ave

New York, NY 10019-6099

Erin Linder Hanig

Attorney at SouthBank Legal: LaDue Curran & Kuehn

100 E Wayne St Ste 300

South Bend, IN 46601

Elizabeth M Gary PHV

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP - NY/NY

101 Park Ave

New York, NY 10178

Laura H McNally PHV

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP - Phi/PA

1701 Market St

Philadelphia, PA 19103-2921

Matthew R Kinsman

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP - Ind/IN/300/2700

300 N Meridian St Ste 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1782

Michael A Feldstein PHV

Attorney at Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz

51 W 52Nd St

New York, NY 10019

Brian E Casey

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP - SB/IN

700 1St Source Bank Center, 100 N Michigan St

South Bend, IN 46601-1632

Paul Vizcarrondo PHV, Jr

Attorney at Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz

51 W 52Nd St

New York, NY 10019

Daniel J Stujenske PHV

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP - NY/NY

425 Lexington Ave

New York, NY 10017-3954

Peter E Kazanoff PHV

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP - NY/NY

425 Lexington Ave

New York, NY 10017-3954

Marc J Sonnenfeld PHV

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP - Phi/PA

1701 Market St

Philadelphia, PA 19103-2921

Amanda N Raad

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP- NY/NY

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036-8704

Other Attorneys

Jason L Krajcer PHV

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park E Ste 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Thomas W Elrod PHV

Attorney at Kirby McInerney LLP

250 Park Ave Ste 820

New York, NY 10177

Ira M Press PHV

Attorney at Kirby McInerney LLP

250 Park Ave Ste 820

New York, NY 10177

Lesley F Portnoy PHV

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park E Ste 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

39 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#230

#227

226 #17

Exhibit Q

226 #16

Exhibit P

226 #15

Exhibit O

226 #14

Exhibit N

226 #13

Exhibit M

226 #12

Exhibit L

226 #11

Exhibit K

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

1 #6

Proposed Summons to Robert J. Marshall, Jr.

1 #5

Proposed Summons to Daniel P. Florin

1 #4

Proposed Summons to David C. Dvorak

1 #3

Proposed Summons to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Sworn Certification of Plaintiff

#1

383 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#230) ORDER granting #227 Motion to Seal Documents. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to retain Plaintiffs' Exhibits E [DE 229-1], J [DE 229-2], and L [DE 229-3] under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/22/19. (ksp) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#229) Sealed Document re #225 Reply to Response to Motion, #228 Memorandum in Support, #226 Affidavit in Support of Motion,,, #227 MOTION to Seal Exhibits E, J and L to Mesropyan Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit J, #3 Exhibit L)(Prongay PHV, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#228) MEMORANDUM in Support of #227 MOTION to Seal Exhibits E, J and L to Mesropyan Declaration filed by Matt Brierley, Steven Castillo, Rajesh M Shah, Local 1500 UFCW. (Prongay PHV, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#227) MOTION to Seal Exhibits E, J and L to Mesropyan Declaration by Plaintiffs Matt Brierley, Steven Castillo, Rajesh M Shah, Local 1500 UFCW. (Prongay PHV, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#226) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #193 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel - Declaration of Vahe Mesropyan filed by Matt Brierley, Steven Castillo, Rajesh M Shah, Local 1500 UFCW. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG)(Prongay PHV, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#225) REPLY to Response to Motion re #193 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel filed by Matt Brierley, Steven Castillo, Rajesh M Shah. (Prongay PHV, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#224) Sealed Document re #223 Memorandum in Opposition,,,,,. (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#223) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #193 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel filed by Christopher B Begley, Betsy J Bernard, Paul M Bisaro, Gail K Boudreaux, Tony W Collins, David C Dvorak, Michael J. Farrell, Daniel P. Florin, Larry Glasscock, Robert A Hagemann, Arthur J Higgins, Robert J. Marshall, Jr, Michael W Michelson, Cecil B Pickett, Jeffrey K Rhodes, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1 - Deposition Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Professor Daniel R. Fischel, #3 Exhibit 2- Rebuttal Report of Professor Fischel in In re Sandisk LLC Securities Litigation, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration and Report of Professor Fischel in City of Sterling case, #5 Exhibit 4 - Expert Report of Vinita M. Juneja, Ph.D., #6 Exhibit 5 - Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Fischel and Exclude Report of Fischel in Beaver Cty. Emps. case, #7 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts from Deposition of Professor Fischel in In re Sandisk LLC Securities Litigation, #8 Exhibit 7 - Deposition Testimony of Steven M. Hamill for Winslow Capital Management, #9 Exhibit 8 - Deposition Testimony of Brian J. Pratt for Wedge Capital Management, #10 Exhibit 9 - Deposition Testimony of Rajesh M. Shah, #11 Exhibit 10 - Deposition Testimony of Matthew Brierley)(Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Set Deadlines. Defendants Opposition Brief due by 7/18/2019. (nal) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#222) ORDER the parties' joint motion to seal DE #219 is GRANTED. The Court ORDERS Defendants to file their Opposition Brief and all attendant exhibits as proposed [DE 219 at 6-286] by 7/18/19 with the redactions reflected in the instant motion on page 28 of Defendants' Opposition Brief [DE 219 at 39] and at 72:2-7, 73:3-24 in Exhibit 9 [DE 219 at 220-21]. Additionally, Defendants shall file, and the Clerk shall maintain, Exhibit 11 completely under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/11/19. (nal) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
214 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Troy S Brown PHV for David C Dvorak, Daniel P. Florin, Robert J. Marshall, Jr, and Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/3/17. (mtr) (Entered: 01/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Application for Attorney Troy S. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3130415(Brown PHV, Troy) (Entered: 12/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER GRANTING #6 STIPULATION/MOTION (Joint) for Establishment of Schedule Following Appointment of Lead Plaintiff by Defendants David C Dvorak, Daniel P. Florin, Robert J. Marshall, Jr, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. The Lead Plaintiff shall have 60 days from the date of the Court's order appointing the Lead Plaintiff within which to file an amended, consolidated complaint or to otherwise designate the operative complaint. Defendants are not required to respond to any complaint in this action until 60 days after the operative complaint is filed or designated by the Lead Plaintiff. In the event the Defendants move to dismiss the operative complaint, the Lead Plaintiff shall have 45 days to file a response, and the Defendants shall have 30 days to file their reply to Lead Plaintiff's response. The requirement to file a Case Management Plan pursuant to Local Rule 16-1 is deferred until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/23/16. (cer) (Entered: 12/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION - Joint Motion for Establishment of Schedule Following Appointment of Lead Plaintiff by Defendants David C Dvorak, Daniel P. Florin, Robert J. Marshall, Jr, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 12/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 12/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A Wolfla on behalf of All Defendants (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 12/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to David C Dvorak, Daniel P. Florin, Robert J. Marshall, Jr, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld) (Entered: 12/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (jld) (Entered: 12/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Offer Korin on behalf of Rajesh M Shah (Korin, Offer) (Entered: 12/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3111586.), filed by Rajesh M Shah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sworn Certification of Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons to David C. Dvorak, #5 Proposed Summons to Daniel P. Florin, #6 Proposed Summons to Robert J. Marshall, Jr.)(Korin, Offer) (Entered: 12/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHAH, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where J.P. Morgan Securities LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Goldman Sachs & Co. is a litigant