This case was last updated from PACER on 10/01/2018 at 07:16:45 (UTC).

Sferrzza v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 Sferrzza filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory H. Woods and Ona T. Wang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-06951

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Gregory H. Woods

Ona T. Wang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Louis David Sferrzza

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Berger

Attorney at Ny Disability, LLC.

1000 Grand Concourse, Suite 1-A

Bronx, NY 10451

Defendant Attorney

Allison Rovner

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office SDNY

86 Chambers St.

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If both parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for the defendant must, within two weeks of the date of this order mail or email directly to the Orders and Judgments Clerk (judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov) a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, a copy of which is attached to this order (and also available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/consent-to-proceed-before-us-magistrate-judge); and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/31/2018) (anc) Modified on 9/5/2018 (anc). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#11

RESTRICTED

#14

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/3/2018) (anc) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#3

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) ORDER: Accordingly, the parties are directed to comply with the Court's August 31, 2018 order forthwith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/15/2018) (anc) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (pc) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#9

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the Commissioner of Social Security shall file an Electronic Certified Administrative Record (e-CAR) on the date on which it files its answer or other responsive pleading. If the Commissioner wishes to file a motion for judgment on the pleadings, any other motion, or a stipulation to remand to the Commissioner, the Commissioner shall do so within thirty (30) days from the filing of the answer and the e-CAR. If Plaintiff wishes to file a cross-motion, Plaintiff must do so within thirty days after the Commissioner's filing of a motion. Opposition to any motion shall be filed within thirty days from service of the motion. Any reply must be filed within fourteen days thereafter. Any motion or opposition must be accompanied by a supporting memorandum of law and include specific citation to the parts of the record on which the party relies. Requests for an extension of any of the dates set forth herein must be made in accordance with the Court's Individual Rule 1(E). In addition, if the Commissioner anticipates that the Commissioner will require an extension of the date by which it must file a motion for judgment on the pleadings, any other motion, or a stipulation of remand to the Commissioner, the Commissioner should request the extension no less than two business days prior to the filing of the e-CAR and answer or other responsive pleading. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/9/2018) (anc) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#2

RESTRICTED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security, Louis David Sferrzza. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/17/2018) (rj) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Allison Rovner dated September 17, 2018 re: Court's Sept. 17, 2018, order regarding Magistrate Judge consent. Document filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Rovner, Allison) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER: Accordingly, the parties are directed to comply with the Court's August 31, 2018 order forthwith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/15/2018) (anc) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Louis David Sferrzza. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 11/26/2018. (Berger, Daniel) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If both parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for the defendant must, within two weeks of the date of this order mail or email directly to the Orders and Judgments Clerk (judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov) a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, a copy of which is attached to this order (and also available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/consent-to-proceed-before-us-magistrate-judge); and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/31/2018) (anc) Modified on 9/5/2018 (anc). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Allison Rovner on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Rovner, Allison) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the Commissioner of Social Security shall file an Electronic Certified Administrative Record (e-CAR) on the date on which it files its answer or other responsive pleading. If the Commissioner wishes to file a motion for judgment on the pleadings, any other motion, or a stipulation to remand to the Commissioner, the Commissioner shall do so within thirty (30) days from the filing of the answer and the e-CAR. If Plaintiff wishes to file a cross-motion, Plaintiff must do so within thirty days after the Commissioner's filing of a motion. Opposition to any motion shall be filed within thirty days from service of the motion. Any reply must be filed within fourteen days thereafter. Any motion or opposition must be accompanied by a supporting memorandum of law and include specific citation to the parts of the record on which the party relies. Requests for an extension of any of the dates set forth herein must be made in accordance with the Court's Individual Rule 1(E). In addition, if the Commissioner anticipates that the Commissioner will require an extension of the date by which it must file a motion for judgment on the pleadings, any other motion, or a stipulation of remand to the Commissioner, the Commissioner should request the extension no less than two business days prior to the filing of the e-CAR and answer or other responsive pleading. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/9/2018) (anc) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (dnh) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/3/2018) (anc) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel Berger. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Louis David Sferzzaa. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pc) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (pc) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Louis David Sferzzaa.(Berger, Daniel) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Commissioner of Social Security, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Louis David Sferzzaa. (Berger, Daniel) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Berger, Daniel) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Louis David Sferzzaa.(Berger, Daniel) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.