This case was last updated from PACER on 01/13/2019 at 07:54:15 (UTC).

Seymour v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2018 Seymour filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and William E. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00625

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timothy Seymour

Defendants

Linda Bastien

Rhonda Surette

Paul Pirraglia

United States of America

John Tuttle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zachary M. Mandell

Attorney at Mandell, Schwartz & Boisclair

One Park Row

Providence, RI 02903

Defendant Attorney

Leslie J. Kane

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

50 Kennedy Plaza, 8Th Floor

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MOTION to Stay filed by United States of America. Responses due by 1/18/2019. (Kane, Leslie) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Timothy Seymour for ROS - USA All Plaintiffs. (Mandell, Zachary) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

3 #5

Summons

3 #4

Summons

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Linda Bastien, Paul Pirraglia, Rhonda Surette, John Tuttle, United States of America and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#2

(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Summons Pirraglia

1 #5

Summons - Bastien

1 #4

Summons - Surette

1 #3

Summons - Tuttle

1 #2

Summons - USA

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1287307 ), filed by Timothy Seymour. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - USA, #3 Summons - Tuttle, #4 Summons - Surette, #5 Summons - Bastien, #6 Summons Pirraglia)(Mandell, Zachary) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2018: #7 Summons) (Potter, Carrie). (Entered: 11/14/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Stay filed by United States of America. Responses due by 1/18/2019. (Kane, Leslie) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Timothy Seymour for ROS - USA All Plaintiffs. (Mandell, Zachary) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Linda Bastien, Paul Pirraglia, Rhonda Surette, John Tuttle, United States of America and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1287307 ), filed by Timothy Seymour. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - USA, #3 Summons - Tuttle, #4 Summons - Surette, #5 Summons - Bastien, #6 Summons Pirraglia)(Mandell, Zachary) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2018: #7 Summons) (Potter, Carrie). (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Linda Bastien, Paul Pirraglia, Rhonda Surette, John Tuttle, United States of America and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1287307 ), filed by Timothy Seymour. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - USA, #3 Summons - Tuttle, #4 Summons - Surette, #5 Summons - Bastien, #6 Summons Pirraglia)(Mandell, Zachary) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2018: #7 Summons) (Potter, Carrie). (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leslie J. Kane