This case was last updated from PACER on 12/24/2018 at 07:05:54 (UTC).

Serpentec, Inc. v. Weems Industries, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/25/2018 Serpentec, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Weems Industries, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jorge L. Alonso. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-07146

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jorge L. Alonso

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Serpentec, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Weems Industries, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

James John Saul

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

311 South Wacker Drive, Suite 4400

Chicago, IL 60606

Kathryn Ann Feiereisel

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

311 South Wacker Drive, Suite 4300

Chicago, IL 60606

Daniel Joel Schwartz

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

311 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 4300

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

David M. Caves

Attorney at Bradley Riley Jacobs PC

320 W. Ohio Street, Suite 3W

Chicago, IL 60654

Todd Clark Jacobs

Attorney at Bradley Riley Jacobs PC

320 W. Ohio Street, Suite 3W

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Serpentec, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15105877. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Serpentec, Inc. by Daniel Joel Schwartz (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Serpentec, Inc. (Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Serpentec, Inc. by Kathryn Ann Feiereisel (Feiereisel, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#6

(#6) Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding Patent or Trademark by Serpentec, Inc. (Feiereisel, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#25

(#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held and continued to 1/17/19 at 9:30 a.m. Parties' MIDP responses shall be served by 1/30/19. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's counterclaim is extended to 1/30/19. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#24

(#24) Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) (Joint Status Report), filed by Plaintiff Serpentec, Inc.. (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#21

(#21) MOTION by Attorney Kathryn A. Feiereisel to withdraw as attorney for Serpentec, Inc., Serpentec, Inc.. No party information provided (Feiereisel, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#23

(#23) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion to withdraw as counsel #21 is granted. Attorney Kathryn Ann Feiereisel is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. Motion hearing date of 12/5/18 is stricken. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Ann Feiereisel for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #21 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/5/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Feiereisel, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#20

(#20) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Weems Industries, Inc. (Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Caves, David) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Weems Industries, Inc. against Serpentec, Inc. . by Weems Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Jacobs, Todd) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

19 #1

Exhibit A

19 #3

Exhibit C

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held and continued to 1/17/19 at 9:30 a.m. Parties' MIDP responses shall be served by 1/30/19. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's counterclaim is extended to 1/30/19. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) (Joint Status Report), filed by Plaintiff Serpentec, Inc.. (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion to withdraw as counsel #21 is granted. Attorney Kathryn Ann Feiereisel is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. Motion hearing date of 12/5/18 is stricken. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Ann Feiereisel for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #21 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/5/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Feiereisel, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION by Attorney Kathryn A. Feiereisel to withdraw as attorney for Serpentec, Inc., Serpentec, Inc.. No party information provided (Feiereisel, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Weems Industries, Inc. (Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Caves, David) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Weems Industries, Inc. against Serpentec, Inc. . by Weems Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Jacobs, Todd) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/20/2018. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing held. Defendant's motion for enlargement of time to answer or otherwise plead #15 is granted to 12/14/18. Enter Order. Status hearing previously set for 12/12/18 is stricken and reset to 12/19/18 at 9:30 a.m. Parties are directed to file a joint status report by 12/14/18. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Motion by Todd Clark Jacobs for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #15 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/20/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Jacobs, Todd) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Weems Industries, Inc. (yt) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, ) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Serpentec, Inc. by James John Saul (Saul, James) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding Patent or Trademark by Serpentec, Inc. (Feiereisel, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Serpentec, Inc. by Kathryn Ann Feiereisel (Feiereisel, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Serpentec, Inc. (Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Serpentec, Inc. by Daniel Joel Schwartz (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Serpentec, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15105877. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.