This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:55:25 (UTC).

Semo Services, Inc. et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Semo Services, Inc filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BNSF Railway Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00234

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brad Warner

Semo Services, Inc.

Jamie Wills

Defendants

BNSF Railway Company

Steven T. Heidzig

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Angela S. McQuage

Attorney at BOYLE BRASHER LLC

1010 Market St., Ste. 950

St. Louis, MO 63101

J. Michael Ponder

Attorney at COOK AND BARKETT

1610 N. Kingshighway, Suite 201, P.O. Box 1180

Cape Girardeau, MO 63702-1180

Kathleen A. Wolz

Attorney at COOK AND BARKETT

1610 N. Kingshighway, Suite 201, P.O. Box 1180

Cape Girardeau, MO 63702-1180

William A. Brasher

Attorney at BOYLE BRASHER, LLC

1010 Market St., Suite 950

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) MEMORANDUM re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Brasher, William) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#11

(#34) SURREPLY to Motion re #11 First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Stoddard County, Missouri filed by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Brasher, William) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#24

(#26) MOTION to Strike #24 Memorandum in Support of Motion 's Request for Fees & Costs or Leave to File Sur-Reply by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Brasher, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#20

(#25) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #22 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #13 MOTION to Change Venue by Plaintiffs Semo Services, Inc., Brad Warner, Jamie Wills. (Wolz, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#6

(#6) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of Stoddard County, filed by Semo Services, Inc., Jamie Wills, Brad Warner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(MFG) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#29

(#29) MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Defendant BNSF's Motion to Transfer Venue Out of Time by Plaintiffs Semo Services, Inc., Brad Warner, Jamie Wills. (Wolz, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit C- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by William A. Brasher for Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Brasher, William) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#3

(#3) MEMORANDUM re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, Original Filing Form by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Brasher, William) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant BNSF Railway Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Brasher, William) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#13

(#25) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #22 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #13 MOTION to Change Venue by Plaintiffs Semo Services, Inc., Brad Warner, Jamie Wills. (Wolz, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#22

(#25) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #22 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #13 MOTION to Change Venue by Plaintiffs Semo Services, Inc., Brad Warner, Jamie Wills. (Wolz, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#34

(#34) SURREPLY to Motion re #11 First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Stoddard County, Missouri filed by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Brasher, William) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B- Secretary of State

1 #1

Exhibit A- State Court Record

#26

(#26) MOTION to Strike #24 Memorandum in Support of Motion 's Request for Fees & Costs or Leave to File Sur-Reply by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Brasher, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#1

(#3) MEMORANDUM re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, Original Filing Form by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Brasher, William) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#25

(#25) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #22 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #13 MOTION to Change Venue by Plaintiffs Semo Services, Inc., Brad Warner, Jamie Wills. (Wolz, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) SURREPLY to Motion re #11 First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Stoddard County, Missouri filed by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Brasher, William) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #29 MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Defendant BNSF's Motion to Transfer Venue Out of Time by Plaintiffs Semo Services, Inc., Brad Warner, Jamie Wills. (Wolz, Kathleen) filed by Semo Services, Inc., Brad Warner, Jamie Wills; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/30/18. (CSG) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #26 MOTION to Strike #24 Memorandum in Support of Motion 's Request for Fees & Costs or Leave to File Sur-Reply by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Brasher, William) filed by BNSF Railway Company; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED IN PART, BNSF is granted leave to file a sur-reply. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/29/18. (CSG) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #22 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #13 MOTION to Change Venue by Plaintiffs Semo Services, Inc., Brad Warner, Jamie Wills. (Wolz, Kathleen) filed by Semo Services, Inc., Brad Warner, Jamie Wills; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/29/18. (CSG) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #29 MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Defendant BNSF's Motion to Transfer Venue Out of Time filed by Plaintiffs Semo Services, Inc., Brad Warner, Jamie Wills. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to File a Response to Defendant BNSF's Motion for Change of Venue Out of Time)(Wolz, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Defendant BNSF's Motion to Transfer Venue Out of Time by Plaintiffs Semo Services, Inc., Brad Warner, Jamie Wills. (Wolz, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #22 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #13 MOTION to Change Venue , #20 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #13 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Plaintiffs Semo Services, Inc., Brad Warner, Jamie Wills. (Wolz, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) RESPONSE to Motion re #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #22 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #13 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendants BNSF Railway Company, Steven T. Heidzig. (Brasher, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION to Strike #24 Memorandum in Support of Motion 's Request for Fees & Costs or Leave to File Sur-Reply by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Brasher, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #22 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #13 MOTION to Change Venue by Plaintiffs Semo Services, Inc., Brad Warner, Jamie Wills. (Wolz, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2018
  • Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (MFG) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CLERK'S ORDER (GJL)..The above styled and numbered case was removed from Stoddard County Circuit Court on October 2, 2018 and assigned to the Eastern Division. After a review of the case, it was determined the case was assigned incorrectly. The case should have been assigned to the Southeastern Division. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled case is transferred to the Southeastern Division and assigned to the Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr., United States District Judge, under cause number 1:18-cv-00234 SNLJ. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that cause number 4:18-cv-01681-UNA be administratively closed. (MFG) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Letter to attorney Angela S. McQuage from Clerk Re:Admission To Practice Law (MFG) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of Stoddard County, filed by Semo Services, Inc., Jamie Wills, Brad Warner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(MFG) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of Stoddard County, filed by Semo Services, Inc., Jamie Wills, Brad Warner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(MFG) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant BNSF Railway Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Brasher, William) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by William A. Brasher for Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Brasher, William) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MEMORANDUM re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, Original Filing Form by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Brasher, William) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MEMORANDUM re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Brasher, William) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Stoddard County Missouri, case number 18SD-CC00080, with receipt number 0865-6791018, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B- Secretary of State, #3 Exhibit C- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Brasher, William) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.