This case was last updated from PACER on 01/18/2019 at 07:32:56 (UTC).

Semler v. Eastbay, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 Semler filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Eastbay, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leo I. Brisbois and Wilhelmina M. Wright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:18-CV-03220

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Leo I. Brisbois

Presiding Judge

Wilhelmina M. Wright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raymond L. Semler

Moose Lake, MN 55767

Defendants

Unknown Jane and John Does at the Minnesota Sex Offender Program Moose Lake

Eastbay, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie D Sarantopoulos

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

80 S 8Th St Ste 1300

Mpls, MN 55402-2136

Corey Christensen

Attorney at Littler Mendelson P.C.

80 South 8Th Street, Ste 1300 Ids Center

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Eastbay, Inc. re #16 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

16 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#16

(#16) REPLY re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Claims filed by Eastbay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sarantopoulos, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

15 #1

Envelope

#15

(#15) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Raymond L. Semler re #14 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG) Document QC'd on 1/7/2019 (CLK). (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#14

(#14) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Claims filed by Raymond L. Semler.(MMG) Document QC'd on 1/7/2019 (CLK). (Entered: 12/20/2018)

12 #2

Envelope

12 #1

Attachment

#12

(#12) LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Raymond L. Semler. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 12/21/2018 (KMH). (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#11

(#11) BRIEFING ORDER re: #5 Motion to Dismiss/General. Responses due by 12/24/2018; Reply due by 1/7/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/3/2018. (VLM) cc: Raymond L. Semler. Modified on 12/4/2018 (JLB). (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER REFERRING ALL DISPOSITIVE AND NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Brisbois. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 12/3/2018. (KLL) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eastbay, Inc. re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Claims (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#8

(#8) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

7 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Claims filed by Eastbay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sarantopoulos, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Claims : Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Claims filed by Eastbay, Inc.. (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Eastbay, Inc. re #16 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REPLY re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Claims filed by Eastbay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sarantopoulos, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Raymond L. Semler re #14 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG) Document QC'd on 1/7/2019 (CLK). (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Claims filed by Raymond L. Semler.(MMG) Document QC'd on 1/7/2019 (CLK). (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) TEXT-ONLY ORDER: In light of the briefing order issued by United States Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois #11 , the January 16, 2019 hearing on Defendant Eastbay, Inc.'s motion to dismiss #5 is CANCELLED. The request of Plaintiff Raymond L. Semler to appear at that hearing by phone, #12 , therefore, is moot. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 12/17/2018. (KLL) cc: Raymond L. Semler. Modified text on 12/18/2018 (JLB). (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Raymond L. Semler. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 12/21/2018 (KMH). (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) BRIEFING ORDER re: #5 Motion to Dismiss/General. Responses due by 12/24/2018; Reply due by 1/7/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/3/2018. (VLM) cc: Raymond L. Semler. Modified on 12/4/2018 (JLB). (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REFERRING ALL DISPOSITIVE AND NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Brisbois. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 12/3/2018. (KLL) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eastbay, Inc. re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Claims (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Claims filed by Eastbay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sarantopoulos, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Claims : Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Claims filed by Eastbay, Inc.. (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • (#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 5th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 18-cv-3220 WMW/LIB. (MMG) cc: Semler. Modified text on 11/19/2018 (MMG). (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eastbay, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Eastbay is a wholly owned subsidiary of Footlocker.com, Inc., which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Foot Locker, Inc., a publicly traded company. Foot Locker, Inc. does not have any parent corporation, and no publicly held corporation or investment fund holds ten percent (10%) or more of Foot Locker, Inc.s stock. (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (MMP). (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Minnesota, Ramsey County District Court, case number 62-cv-18-6453 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6503026) filed by Eastbay, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less