This case was last updated from PACER on 12/05/2018 at 07:37:24 (UTC).

Seminole Tribe of Florida v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2016 Seminole Tribe of Florida filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, NA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lurana S. Snow and William P. Dimitrouleas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:16-CV-60414

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lurana S. Snow

Presiding Judge

William P. Dimitrouleas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Seminole Tribe of Florida

John Does 1-3

Defendants

Wells Fargo Bank, NA

Kim Scott

Thomas Joyce

Debra Charbonnet

Melissa Lader Barnhardt

Michael S Carris

Mark Lake

Marc Spelane

Terri Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Albert L. Frevola, Jr.

150 Sw 12Th Avenue, Suite 440

Pompano Beach, FL 33069

Jack Kallus

633 South Federal Highway

For Lauderdale, FL 33301

William R. Scherer

Attorney at Conrad & Scherer

633 S Federal Highway, 8Th Floor Po Box 14723

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33302-4723

Defendant Attorneys

Mark W. Kinghorn

Attorney at McGuire Woods, LLP

201 North Tryon Street, Suite 3000

Charlotte, NC 28202

Peter J. Covington

Attorney at McGuire Woods, LLP

201 N Tryon Street, Suite 3000

Charlotte, NC 28202

George S. LeMieux

450 E Las Olas Blvd., Suite 1400

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

William O. L. Hutchinson

Attorney at McGuire Woods, LLP

201 North Tryon Street, Suite 3000

Charlotte, NC 28202

Michael Walter Marcil

450 E Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 1400

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#46

(#46) ORDER Adopting #45 Report and Recommendations, denying #41 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/19/2016. (pes) (Entered: 09/19/2016)

#45

(#45) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #41 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed by John Does 1-3, Seminole Tribe of Florida: Recommending that Plaintiffs' Verified Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) (ECF No. #41 ) be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 9/16/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 8/30/2016. (pes) (Entered: 08/30/2016)

41 #6

Exhibit F

41 #5

Exhibit E

41 #4

Exhibit D

41 #3

Exhibit C

41 #2

Exhibit B

41 #1

Exhibit A

#41

(#41) Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) by John Does 1-3, Seminole Tribe of Florida. Responses due by 8/15/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Kallus, Jack) (Entered: 07/28/2016)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, NA identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, NA (LeMieux, George) (Entered: 03/02/2016)

#4

(#4) Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (ail) (Entered: 03/02/2016)

#3

(#3) Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (ail) (Entered: 03/02/2016)

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#6) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Melissa Lader Barnhardt, Michael S Carris, Debra Charbonnet, Terri Johnson, Thomas Joyce, Mark Lake, Kim Scott, Marc Spelane, Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Attorney George S. LeMieux added to party Melissa Lader Barnhardt(pty:dft), Attorney George S. LeMieux added to party Michael S Carris(pty:dft), Attorney George S. LeMieux added to party Debra Charbonnet(pty:dft), Attorney George S. LeMieux added to party Terri Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney George S. LeMieux added to party Thomas Joyce(pty:dft), Attorney George S. LeMieux added to party Mark Lake(pty:dft), Attorney George S. LeMieux added to party Kim Scott(pty:dft), Attorney George S. LeMieux added to party Marc Spelane(pty:dft). Responses due by 3/21/2016 (LeMieux, George) (Entered: 03/02/2016)

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) ORDER Adopting #45 Report and Recommendations, denying #41 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/19/2016. (pes) (Entered: 09/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #41 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed by John Does 1-3, Seminole Tribe of Florida: Recommending that Plaintiffs' Verified Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) (ECF No. #41 ) be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 9/16/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 8/30/2016. (pes) (Entered: 08/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) RESPONSE in Support re #41 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed by John Does 1-3, Seminole Tribe of Florida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 2 - Chart: Objections & Responses)(Kallus, Jack) (Entered: 08/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed by Melissa Lader Barnhardt, Michael S Carris, Debra Charbonnet, Terri Johnson, Thomas Joyce, Mark Lake, Kim Scott, Marc Spelane, Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Replies due by 8/25/2016. (Marcil, Michael) (Entered: 08/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ORDER REFERRING #41 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed by John Does 1-3, Seminole Tribe of Florida Motions referred to Judge Lurana S. Snow Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/28/2016. (ail) (Entered: 07/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) by John Does 1-3, Seminole Tribe of Florida. Responses due by 8/15/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Kallus, Jack) (Entered: 07/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #37 Transmittal Letter Sent (pes) (Entered: 06/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #37 Transmittal Letter Sent (pes) (Entered: 06/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand held on May 25, 2016 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas, 1-46 pages, Court Reporter: Glenda Powers, 305-523-5022 / Glenda_Powers@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2016. (gps) (Entered: 06/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Transmittal Letter Sent with Order of Remand to: 17th Judicial Circuit Court, Broward County, FL. State Court Case Number: CACE-16-00592(08) (pes) (Entered: 06/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #7 , #8 , and #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/7/2016. (pes) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Peter J. Covington. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-8536410 by Melissa Lader Barnhardt, Michael S Carris, Debra Charbonnet, Terri Johnson, Thomas Joyce, Mark Lake, Kim Scott, Marc Spelane, Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Responses due by 3/21/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LeMieux, George) (Entered: 03/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark W. Kinghorn. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-8536373 by Melissa Lader Barnhardt, Michael S Carris, Debra Charbonnet, Terri Johnson, Thomas Joyce, Mark Lake, Kim Scott, Marc Spelane, Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Responses due by 3/21/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LeMieux, George) (Entered: 03/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William O. L. Hutchinson. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-8536323 by Melissa Lader Barnhardt, Michael S Carris, Debra Charbonnet, Terri Johnson, Thomas Joyce, Mark Lake, Kim Scott, Marc Spelane, Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Responses due by 3/21/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LeMieux, George) (Entered: 03/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Melissa Lader Barnhardt, Michael S Carris, Debra Charbonnet, Terri Johnson, Thomas Joyce, Mark Lake, Kim Scott, Marc Spelane, Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Attorney George S. LeMieux added to party Melissa Lader Barnhardt(pty:dft), Attorney George S. LeMieux added to party Michael S Carris(pty:dft), Attorney George S. LeMieux added to party Debra Charbonnet(pty:dft), Attorney George S. LeMieux added to party Terri Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney George S. LeMieux added to party Thomas Joyce(pty:dft), Attorney George S. LeMieux added to party Mark Lake(pty:dft), Attorney George S. LeMieux added to party Kim Scott(pty:dft), Attorney George S. LeMieux added to party Marc Spelane(pty:dft). Responses due by 3/21/2016 (LeMieux, George) (Entered: 03/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, NA identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, NA (LeMieux, George) (Entered: 03/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (ail) (Entered: 03/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (ail) (Entered: 03/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • (#2) Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow (ail) (Entered: 03/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT) Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-8531823, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(LeMieux, George) (Entered: 03/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less