This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 17:45:35 (UTC).

Selfors v. A.H. Bennett Company et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 Selfors filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A H Bennett Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel L. Hovland and Alice R. Senechal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00251

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel L. Hovland

Referral Judge

Alice R. Senechal

 

Party Details

Defendants

Foster Wheeler LLC

Singer Safety Company

Whittier Filtration, Inc.

Owens-Illinois, Inc.

United Conveyor Corporation

Zurn Industries, LLC

Weil McLain Company

RCH Newco II, LLC

Bell Asbestos Mines, Ltd.

Goodin Company

McMaster Carr Supply Company

General Engineering Development Corporation

Industrial Holdings Corporation

Ingersoll-Rand Company

A.H. Bennett Company

Ericsson, Inc.

Riley Power, Inc.

Paul W. Abbott Company, Inc.

Jamar Company, The

Sprinkmann Sons Corporation of Illinois

59 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew R. Thibodeau

Attorney at Thibodeau, Johnson & Feriancek

302 West Superior Street, Suite 800

Duluth, MN 55802

David E. Scouton

Attorney at Thibodeau, Johnson & Feriancek

302 West Superior Street, Suite 800

Duluth, MN 55802

Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

250 Marquette Ave., Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Jason Mohr

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

250 Marquette Ave., Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Kyle B. Mansfield

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

1200 Marquette Plaza, 250 Marquette Ave

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Joanna M. Salmen

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

250 Marquette Ave., Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Patrick T. Tierney

Attorney at Collins, Buckley, Sauntry & Haugh PLLP

West 1100 First National Bank Building, 332 Minnesota Street

St. Paul, MN 55101-1379

John C. Hughes

Attorney at Meagher & Geer, P.L.L.P. (MN)

33 South Sixth Street, Suite 4400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Heather H. Neubauer

Attorney at Meagher & Geer, P.L.L.P. (MN)

33 South Sixth Street, Suite 4400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

David T. Schach

Attorney at Meagher & Geer, P.L.L.P. (MN)

33 South Sixth Street, Suite 4400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jon P. Parrington

Attorney at Pustorino, Tilton, Parrington & Lindquist, PLLC

6600 France Avenue South, Ste. 680

Minneapolis, MN 55435

Benjamin J. Hasbrouck

Attorney at Fredrikson & Byron P.A. (Fargo)

51 Broadway North, Suite 400

Fargo, ND 58102

Todd E. Zimmerman

Attorney at Fredrikson & Byron P.A. (Fargo)

51 Broadway North, Suite 400

Fargo, ND 58102

Other Attorneys

Jane L. Dynes

Attorney at Serkland Law Firm, P.C.

10 Roberts St., P.O. Box 6017

Fargo, ND 58108-6017

Jeanette Boechler

Attorney at Boechler, P.C.

300 Np Ave., Ste. 101

Fargo, ND 58107

Paul Rudell Oppegard

Attorney at Oppegard Law Firm

2901 South Frontage Road, Po Box 657

Moorhead, MN 56561

Richard J. Leighton

Attorney at Johnson Killen & Seiler PA

800 Wells Fargo Center, 230 W Superior St

Duluth, MN 55802

Tyler Johnson Siewert

Attorney at Schweigert, Klemin & McBride, P.C.

116 N. 2Nd Street, Po Box 955

Bismarck, ND 58502

Cassandra A. Marka

Attorney at Zimney Foster PC

3100 S Columbia Rd, Suite 200

Grand Forks, ND 58201

David D. Schweigert

Attorney at Schweigert, Klemin & McBride, P.C.

116 N. 2Nd Street, Po Box 955

Bismarck, ND 58502

15 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#98

#97

#96

#95

94 #2

Exhibit 2-Keene Corporation's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of In

94 #1

Exhibit 1-February 21, 1999 Deposition of Andrew I. Olerud, Jr.

#94

#93

#63

1 #15

Exhibit 15 - Public Law 85-685

1 #14

Exhibit 14 - Public Law 765

1 #13

Exhibit 13 - Public Law 534

1 #12

Exhibit 12 - 5/12/55 Article "Minot Air Base Bid Opening Set"

1 #11

Exhibit 11 - 3/7/58 Article "Minot Air Base Gets More Funds"

1 #10

Exhibit 10 - 10/27/55 Article "Iowa Firm Low on Minot Bids"

1 #9

Exhibit 9 - 10/26/55 Article "Kiewit Bids Low at Minot"

1 #8

Exhibit 8 - 7/6/55 Article "To Break Ground for Base at Minot"

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - Minot Air Force Base History

186 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) *RESTRICTED - DUPLICATE FILING - SEE 99 * (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting unopposed #98 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #63 MOTION to Remand. Reply due by 3/15/2019. (AS) Modified on 3/4/2019 to restrict access. NEF Regenerated. (as) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) (Text Only) ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #98 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #63 MOTION to Remand. Reply due by 3/15/2019. (MM) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #93 Response to Motion to Remand This Case to its State Court of Origin by Catherine Selfors. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Burnham Holdings, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney by Peter K. Doely on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Doely, Peter) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand by Honeywell, Inc..(Flom, Joel) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET CORRECTION re: #94 Affidavit. Clerk's office added descriptions to exhibits. (cjs) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) AFFIDAVIT DECLARATION OF HEATHER H. NEUBAUER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BUILDING SPRINKLERS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND re #93 Response to Motion by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-February 21, 1999 Deposition of Andrew I., Olerud, Jr., #2 Exhibit 2-Keene Corporation's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit 3-Keene Corporation's Response to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Request for Production)(Neubauer, Heather) Modified on 2/11/2019 to add exhibit descriptions (cjs). (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) RESPONSE to Motion re #63 MOTION to Remand DEFENDANT BUILDING SPRINKLER COMPANY INC.S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND filed by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #91 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Claire Louise Smith terminated. (AS) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.H. Bennett Company. (Brotten, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockbestos-Suprenant Cable Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Marmon Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Other Affiliate RSCC Wire & Cable LLC for Rockbestos-Suprenant Cable Corp... (Brotten, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Riley Power, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Babcock Power Inc. for Riley Power, Inc... (Mohr, Jason) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weil McLain Company identifying Corporate Parent The Marley-Wylain Company, Corporate Parent The Marley Company LLC, Other Affiliate SPX Corporation, Other Affiliate United Dominion Industries, Inc. for Weil McLain Company.. (Mohr, Jason) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cleaver Brooks identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver-Holdings, Inc. for Cleaver Brooks.. (Mohr, Jason) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Affidavit, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (rh) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. (rh) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Elizabeth M. Sorenson Brotten re #1 Notice of Removal by A.H. Bennett Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cass Co. Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Answer of A.H. Bennett Company, #3 Exhibit 3 - Answer of Border States Industries, Inc., #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Greg Thrall, #5 Exhibit 5 - Answer of Foster Wheeler, LLC, #6 Exhibit 6 - Paul W. Abbott Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #7 Exhibit 7 - Answer and Defenses of Industrial Contractors, Inc., #8 Exhibit 8 - Industrial Contractors Authorizations directed to Plaintiff, #9 Exhibit 9 - Northwest Iron Fireman's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #10 Exhibit 10 - Answer of Western Steel & Plumbing, Inc., #11 Exhibit 11 - Affidavit of Maury Kamins, #12 Exhibit 12 - Answer of Owens-Illinois, Inc., #13 Exhibit 13 - Answer of Crane Co., #14 Exhibit 14 - Answer of Ingersoll-Rand Company, #15 Exhibit 15 - Answer of United Conveyor Corporation, #16 Exhibit 16 - Answer of H.B. Fuller Company, #17 Exhibit 17 - Answer of Trane U.S., Inc., #18 Exhibit 18 - Answer of Industrial Holdings Corporation, #19 Exhibit 19 - Answer of Northern Plumbing Supply, Inc., #20 Exhibit 20 - Answer of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, #21 Exhibit 21 - Answer of Singer Safety Company, #22 Exhibit 22 - Answer and Answer to Crossclaims of Research-Cottrell, Inc., n/k/a AWT Air Company, #23 Exhibit 23 - Answer of Riley Power, Inc., #24 Exhibit 24 - Answer of Weil-McLain, #25 Exhibit 25 - Answer of Whittier Filtration, Inc., #26 Exhibit 26 - Answer of Fargo-Moorhead Insulation Company, #27 Exhibit 27 - Affidavit of Jon Parrington Certifying Correct Identity of Manufacturer of Product, #28 Exhibit 28 - Answer of McMaster Carr Supply Company, #29 Exhibit 29 Answer of ITT Corporation (Bell & Gossett), #30 Exhibit 30 - Answer of Goulds Pumps LLC, #31 Exhibit 31 - Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.'s Answer, #32 Exhibit 32 - Answer of Goodrich Corporation, #33 Exhibit 33 - Answer of General Engineering Development Corporation, #34 Exhibit 34 - Answer of Raytheon Constructors, Inc., #35 Exhibit 35 - Answer and Defenses of CBS Corporation, #36 Exhibit 36 - Answer of Carol Cable Company, #37 Exhibit 37 - Answer of RCH Newco II, LLC, #38 Exhibit 38 - Answer of Zurn Industries, LLC, #39 Exhibit 39 - Praxair Distribution, Inc.'s Answer, #40 Exhibit 40 - Answer of Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., #41 Exhibit 41 - Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Bayer CropScience, Inc., #42 Exhibit 42 - Answer and Affirmative Defenses of CertainTeed Corporation, #43 Exhibit 43 - Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Union Carbide Corporation, #44 Exhibit 44 - Answer of Foster Products Corporation, #45 Exhibit 45 - Answer of The Jamar Company, #46 Exhibit 46 - Apollo Piping Supply, Inc.'s Answer, #47 Exhibit 47 - Answer of Walker Jamar Company, #48 Exhibit 48 - Answer of RSCC Wire & Cable , LLC, #49 Exhibit 49 - Answer of General Electric Company, #50 Exhibit 50 - Chicago-Wilcox Manufacturing Company's Answer, #51 Exhibit 51 - Affidavit of Edward Gardiner Certifying Non-Manufacturer Status) (rh). (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by A.H. Bennett Company, Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. from Cass Co. District Court, case number 09-2018-cv-3871. Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000263. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cass Co. Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - 1990 Lawsuit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Work History of Duane Selfors from Prior Lawsuit, #4 Exhibit 4 - 7/23/92 Deposition of Duane Selfors, #5 Exhibit 5 - 1/20/97 Deposition of Duane Selfors, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order and Judgment Dismissing Prior Lawsuit, #7 Exhibit 7 - Minot Air Force Base History, #8 Exhibit 8 - 7/6/55 Article "To Break Ground for Base at Minot", #9 Exhibit 9 - 10/26/55 Article "Kiewit Bids Low at Minot", #10 Exhibit 10 - 10/27/55 Article "Iowa Firm Low on Minot Bids", #11 Exhibit 11 - 3/7/58 Article "Minot Air Base Gets More Funds", #12 Exhibit 12 - 5/12/55 Article "Minot Air Base Bid Opening Set", #13 Exhibit 13 - Public Law 534, #14 Exhibit 14 - Public Law 765, #15 Exhibit 15 - Public Law 85-685, #16 Exhibit 16 - Public Law 87-554, #17 Exhibit 17 - 6/14/61 Article "Minot Area Will Have ICBM Sites", #18 Exhibit 18 - 10/4/61 Article "Minuteman Base Aide is Assigned", #19 Exhibit 19 - 11/24/61 Article "First Minuteman Property Bought from Kief Couple", #20 Exhibit 20 - 12/21/61 Article "$67 Million Low on Missile Work", #21 Exhibit 21 - Specifications for SAC Missile Facility, #22 Exhibit 22 - 6/30/87 Deposition of William Sornsin, #23 Exhibit 23 - 9/28/83 Deposition of William Sornsin, #24 Exhibit 24 - 8/21/91 Deposition of Herbert Gartner, #25 Exhibit 25 - 1/18/83 Deposition of Andrew Olerud, Jr., #26 Exhibit 26 - 12/5/91 Deposition of Andrew Olerud, Jr., #27 Exhibit 27 - 1/25/83 Deposition of James Nodsle), #28 Exhibit 28 - 3/23/82 Deposition of James Matthews (Vol. 1), #29 Exhibit 29 - 3/24/18 Deposition of James Matthews (Vol. 2), #30 Exhibit 30 - 10/15/91 Deposition of Rudolph Opp, #31 Exhibit 31 - 7/18/94 Deposition of Rudolph Opp, #32 Exhibit 32 - 7/18/00 Deposition of Bruce Bergson, #33 Exhibit 33 - Declaration of Kyle Dotson, #34 Exhibit 34 - 4/6/82 Deposition of Noralf Tweit), #35 Civil Cover Sheet) (rh). Modified on 1/3/2019 to correct docket text. (rm) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sprinkmann Sons Corporation of Illinois is a litigant

Latest cases where Singer Safety Company is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION is a litigant