This case was last updated from PACER on 11/11/2018 at 08:01:20 (UTC).

SEED Eco Lounge, LLC v. Alqahtani et al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2018 SEED Eco Lounge, LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Alqahtani. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William T. Moore, Jr, G. R. Smith and James E. Graham. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00217

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William T. Moore, Jr

Referral Judges

G. R. Smith

James E. Graham

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEED Eco Lounge, LLC

Defendants

Meshari Alqahtani

Savannah, GA 31405

SAMBA Financial Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Y. Rahimi, II

Attorney at Rahimi, Hughes & Padgett, LLC

33 Bull Street, Suite 590

Savannah, GA 31401

Taylor Dove

Attorney at Rahimi, Hughes & Padgett, LLC

33 Bull Street #590

Savannah, GA 31401

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint for SAMBA Financial Group served on Andrea Daley-Chappell on 10/26/2018, filed by SEED Eco Lounge, LLC. (Rahimi, Joseph) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Meshari Alqahtani.(trb) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Meshari Alqahtani on 10/02/2018, filed by SEED Eco Lounge, LLC. (Rahimi, Joseph) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#7

(#7) Litigants' Bill of Rights by SEED Eco Lounge, LLC. (Rahimi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by SEED Eco Lounge, LLC. (Rahimi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

5 #1

Exhibit Exhibit "A" to First Amended Complaint

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SEED Eco Lounge, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" to First Amended Complaint)(Rahimi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within fourteen days from the date of this order listing all members of Plaintiff Seed Eco Lounge, LLC and their citizenships. (Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2018.) Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr. on 9/17/18. (trb) Modified on 9/18/2018 (jlh). (Entered: 09/18/2018)

3 #1

Litigants' Bill of Rights

#3

(#3) GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/13/18. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (trb) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (trb) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SEED Eco Lounge, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(trb) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: SAMBA Financial Group answer due 11/16/2018. (trb) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint for SAMBA Financial Group served on Andrea Daley-Chappell on 10/26/2018, filed by SEED Eco Lounge, LLC. (Rahimi, Joseph) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Meshari Alqahtani.(trb) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Meshari Alqahtani answer due 10/23/2018. (trb) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Graham. Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (wwp) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Meshari Alqahtani on 10/02/2018, filed by SEED Eco Lounge, LLC. (Rahimi, Joseph) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Litigants' Bill of Rights by SEED Eco Lounge, LLC. (Rahimi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by SEED Eco Lounge, LLC. (Rahimi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SEED Eco Lounge, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" to First Amended Complaint)(Rahimi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within fourteen days from the date of this order listing all members of Plaintiff Seed Eco Lounge, LLC and their citizenships. (Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2018.) Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr. on 9/17/18. (trb) Modified on 9/18/2018 (jlh). (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/13/18. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (trb) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (trb) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, Receipt Number 113J-2446550. (trb) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SEED Eco Lounge, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(trb) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less