This case was last updated from PACER on 12/17/2018 at 20:01:29 (UTC).

Securities & Exchange Commission v. 1 Global Capital LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Securities Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against 1 Global Capital LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Beth Bloom and Alicia O. Valle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:18-CV-61991

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

Referral Judge

Alicia O. Valle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities & Exchange Commission

Defendants

DIGI South LLC

Ganador Enterprises, LLC

1Global Capital LLC

Carl Ruderman

Bright Smile Financing, LLC

Media Pay LLC

Ruderman Family Trust

Pay Now Direct LLC

BRR Block Inc.

1West Capital LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher E. Martin

Attorney at Securities & Exchange Commission

801 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1800

Miami, FL 33131

Robert Kent Levenson

Attorney at Securities & Exchange Commission

801 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1800

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

Jared Edward Dwyer

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG, P.A.

333 Se 2Nd Avenue, Suite 4400

Miami, FL 33131

Stephanie Peral

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig

333 Se 2Nd Avenue

Miami, FL 33131

Paul J. Keenan, Jr.

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig

1221 Brickell Avenue

Miami, FL 33131

Michael Anthony Pineiro

Attorney at Marcus Neiman & Rashbaum LLP

2 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 1750

Miami, FL 33131

Jeffrey David Marcus

Attorney at Marcus Neiman & Rashbaum, LLP

One Biscayne Tower - Suite 1750, 2 South Biscayne Boulevard

Miami, FL 33131

Daniel Lawrence Rashbaum

Attorney at Marcus Neiman & Rashbaum LLP

2 South Biscayne Blvd., Suite 1750

Miami, FL 33131

Jeffrey Adam Neiman

Attorney at Marcus Neiman & Rashbaum LLP

100 Southeast Third Avenue, Suite 805

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394

 

Court Documents

#122

(#122) STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status Report due by 12/17/2018. If Bridge Bank has completed the production of documents then the Receiver shall file a response to the Motion, ECF No. #77 , by December 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/14/2018. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

121 #3

Exhibit 3

121 #2

Exhibit 2

121 #1

Exhibit 1

#121

(#121) MOTION The Receiver's First Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses by Jon A. Sale. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Cavallo, Christopher) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

120 #1

Exhibit A

77 #2

Affidavit Declaration of Monique D. Jewett-Brewster

77 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Lori Edwards

#77

(#122) STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status Report due by 12/17/2018. If Bridge Bank has completed the production of documents then the Receiver shall file a response to the Motion, ECF No. #77 , by December 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/14/2018. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Appointment of Receiver and Memorandum of Law by Securities & Exchange Commission. Responses due by 9/6/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(cbr) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Its Emergency Ex Parte Motion and Memorandum of Law for an Asset Freeze and Other Relief in Excess of the 20 Page Limit by Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(cbr) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#4

(#4) Plaintiff's Certification Pursuant to Rule 65(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Securities & Exchange Commission (cbr) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

(#10) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/23/2018. See attached document for full details. (ane) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint for Conjunctive and Other Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cbr) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

248 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#122) STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status Report due by 12/17/2018. If Bridge Bank has completed the production of documents then the Receiver shall file a response to the Motion, ECF No. #77 , by December 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/14/2018. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#121) MOTION The Receiver's First Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses by Jon A. Sale. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Cavallo, Christopher) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#120) MOTION for Approval of Settlement Agreement Related to Ganador Enterprises, LLC by Jon A. Sale. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cavallo, Christopher) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#119) REPLY to Response to Motion re #103 MOTION TO DISMISS #79 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Carl Ruderman. (Pineiro, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#118) STATUS REPORT The Receiver's First Status Report by Jon A. Sale (Cavallo, Christopher) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#117) JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT 1 GLOBAL CAPITAL LLC AND RELIEF DEFENDANT 1 WEST CAPITAL LLC; granting #116 Motion for Judgment. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/27/2018. See attached document for full details. (ail) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#116) Unopposed MOTION for Judgment against Defendant 1 Global Capital LLC and Relief Defendant 1 West Capital LLC and Notice of Filing Consent to Judgment by Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Consent of Defendant 1 Global Capital LLC and Relief Defendant 1 West Capital LLC to Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order - Exhibit B, Judgment against 1 Global Capital LLC and 1 West Capital LLC)(Martin, Christopher) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#115) ORDER granting #98 Motion to Expand Receivership Over the Ruderman Family Trust and Bright Smile Trust. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/20/2018. See attached document for full details. (ar2) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#114) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #113 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #113 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant Carl Ruderman shall file his Reply in support of his Motion to Dismiss by November 30, 2018. Mr. Ruderman may submit a Reply that is up to 15 pages in length. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#113) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss re #109 Response in Opposition to Motion, ( Responses due by 12/4/2018), Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Carl Ruderman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pineiro, Michael) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/23/2018. See attached document for full details. (ane) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cbr) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Index of Exhibits to Emergency Ex Parte Motion and Memorandum of Law for Asset Freeze and Other Relief by Securities & Exchange Commission re #7 MOTION Emergency Ex Parte Motion and Memorandum of Law for Asset Freeze and Other Relief (cbr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2018: #1 Exhibits 1-7, #2 Exhibits 8-10, #3 Exhibits 11-15, #4 Exhibits 16-24, #5 Exhibits 25-31, #6 Exhibits 32-39, #7 Exhibit 40, #8 Exhibit 41-49, #9 Exhibits 50-55) (cbr). (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Emergency Ex Parte Motion and Memorandum of Law for Asset Freeze and Other Relief by Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(cbr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2018: #2 Exhibit) (cbr). (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Appointment of Receiver and Memorandum of Law by Securities & Exchange Commission. Responses due by 9/6/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(cbr) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Its Emergency Ex Parte Motion and Memorandum of Law for an Asset Freeze and Other Relief in Excess of the 20 Page Limit by Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(cbr) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Plaintiff's Certification Pursuant to Rule 65(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Securities & Exchange Commission (cbr) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Plaintiff Motion to File Under Seal Its Complaint, Emergency Ex Parte Motion and Memorandum of Law for an Asset Freeze and Other Relief, Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Appointment of Receiver, and Other Documents (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (cbr) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cbr) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint for Conjunctive and Other Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cbr) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less