This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2021 at 11:19:45 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commission v. Ralph T. Iannelli et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 Securities and Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Ralph T Iannelli. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alexander F. MacKinnon and Fernando M. Olguin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-05008

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Securities & Exchange Commission

Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendants

Ralph T Iannelli

Essex Capital Corporation

Intervenors

TERRIE MERSHON

BILL LAWARRE

KELLEY PELLEGRI

BARRETT HILZER

RONALD P TOMSIC

GEOFF GRANT

LINDA CASTLE-HILL

PAUL WOLANSKY

KEVIN SCHULTZ

LOWELL FAMILY TRUST

DWIGHT LOWELL

JUDY FOREMAN

SCOTT GREER

KEMP FOUNDATION

IRA MAURICE SULLIVAN

BRAD WHEATLEY

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Douglas M Miller

Attorney at US Securities and Exchange Commission

444 South Flower Street Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Gary Y Leung

Attorney at US Securities and Exchange Commission

444 South Flower Street Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Yolanda Ochoa

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

444 South Flower Street, Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Shuman Sohrn

Attorney at US Securities and Exchange Commission

100 F Street Ne Mailstop 5628

Washington, DC 20549

Defendant Attorneys

J Jorge DeNeve

Attorney at O'Melveny and Myers LLP

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Steven J Olson

Attorney at O'Melveny and Myers LLP

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2899

Kevin M Yopp

Attorney at Law Offices of Kevin M Yopp

401 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor Penthouse

Santa Monica, CA 90401-1456

Andrew B Holmes

Attorney at Holmes Taylor Cowan and Jones LLP

811 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1460

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Joshua Andrew del Castillo

Attorney at Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory and Natsis

865 S Figueroa Street, Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2543

Intervenor Attorneys

Mark Riera

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4308

Brian Paul Miller

Attorney at Akerman LLP

98 Se 7Th Street Suite 1100

Miami, FL 33131

Brian P Miller

Attorney at Akerman LLP

98 Se 7Th Street Suite 1100

Miami, FL 33131

Michael O Mena

Attorney at Akerman LLP

98 Se 7Th Street Suite 1100

Miami, FL 33131

Ellen S Robbins

Attorney at Akerman LLP

601 W. Fifth Street, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michael D Napoli

Attorney at Akerman LLP

2001 Ross Avenue Suite 3600

Dallas, TX 75201

Evelina Gentry

Attorney at Akerman LLP

601 West Fifth Street Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Other Attorneys

David R Zaro

Attorney at Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory and Natsis LLP

865 South Figueroa Street Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2543

Norman M Aspis

Attorney at Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory and Natsis LLP

865 South Figueroa Street Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90017

David L Cousineau

Attorney at Cappello and Noel LLP

831 State Street

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

A Barry Cappello

Attorney at Cappello and Noel LLP

831 State Street

Santa Barbara, CA 93101-3227

 

Court Documents

#204

(#204) ORDER GRANTING SEVENTH INTERIM APPLICATION OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKER, AND ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER FOR PAYMENT OF FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES #202 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#201

(#201) ORDER ON SIXTH INTERIM REPORT AND PETITION FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKLER #197 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

197 #1

Proposed Order

#197

(#197) PETITION for Order for on Sixth Interim Report and Petition for Instructions of Receiver, Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit 1) filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (del Castillo, Joshua) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

196 #4

Proposed Order

196 #3

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

196 #2

Declaration of Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit 1)

#196

(#196) APPLICATION for Order for Approving Sixth Interim Application of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, and Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis, LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver, for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses [April 1, 2020 - June 30, 2020] filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Application set for hearing on 1/7/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Sixth Interim Application of Receiver and Counsel (with Exhibits A, B and C), #2 Declaration of Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit 1), #3 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #4 Proposed Order) (Aspis, Norman) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

5 #2

Exhibit 2

5 #1

Exhibit 1

4 #3

Supplement

4 #2

Proposed Order

4 #1

Memorandum

#4

(#6) DECLARATION of Rhoda Chang in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #4 filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8 Part 1, #9 Exhibit 8 Part 2, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Leung, Gary) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Miller, Douglas) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Miller, Douglas) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

#1

(#9) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Essex Capital Corporation, Ralph T Iannelli. (esa) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

434 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#204) ORDER GRANTING SEVENTH INTERIM APPLICATION OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKER, AND ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER FOR PAYMENT OF FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES #202 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#203) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Application for Reimbursement #202 is taken off calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 3/4/2021. An order with the court's ruling will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#202) APPLICATION for Order for Approving Seventh Interim Application of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, and Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver, for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses [July 1, 2020 - December 31, 2020] filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Application set for hearing on 3/4/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Seventh Fee Application of Receiver and Counsel (with Exhibits A-C), #2 Declaration of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, (with Exhibit 1), #3 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #4 Proposed Order) (Aspis, Norman) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#201) ORDER ON SIXTH INTERIM REPORT AND PETITION FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKLER #197 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#200) ORDER GRANTING SIXTH INTERIM APPLICATION OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKER, AND ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER, FOR PAYMENT OF FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES #196 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#199) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the Court's own motion, the SIXTH INTERIM APPLICATION OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKLER, AND ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER, FOR PAYMENT OF FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES #196 and the SIXTH INTERIM REPORT AND PETITION FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKLER #197 , currently set for January 7, 2021, are taken off calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on that date. The court may order further briefing or other proceedings, at any time, as appropriate. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#198) Notice of Filing re: PETITION for Order for on Sixth Interim Report and Petition for Instructions of Receiver, Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit 1) #197 (del Castillo, Joshua) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#197) PETITION for Order for on Sixth Interim Report and Petition for Instructions of Receiver, Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit 1) filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (del Castillo, Joshua) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#196) APPLICATION for Order for Approving Sixth Interim Application of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, and Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis, LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver, for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses [April 1, 2020 - June 30, 2020] filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Application set for hearing on 1/7/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Sixth Interim Application of Receiver and Counsel (with Exhibits A, B and C), #2 Declaration of Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit 1), #3 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #4 Proposed Order) (Aspis, Norman) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#195) ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKLER, FOR AUTHORITY TO ESTABLISH DISGORGEMENT PROCEDURES AND UNDERTAKE DISGORGEMENT EFFORTS #190 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin (lc) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
184 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The motion in the docket entry number referenced above was filed before judges were assigned to this case, and is missing the hearing date, hearing time, and/or name of the judicial officer. See Local Rule 7-4. You must file and serve an Amended Notice of Motion with accurate hearing information. (esa) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Essex Capital Corporation, Ralph T Iannelli. (esa) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DECLARATION of Rhoda Chang in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #4 filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8 Part 1, #9 Exhibit 8 Part 2, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Leung, Gary) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DECLARATION of Yolanda Ochoa in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #4 filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 Part 1, #5 Exhibit 4 Part 2, #6 Exhibit 4 Part 3, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9 Part 1, #12 Exhibit 9 Part 2, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16 Part 1, #20 Exhibit 16 Part 2, #21 Exhibit 16 Part 3, #22 Exhibit 17, #23 Exhibit 18, #24 Exhibit 19, #25 Exhibit 20, #26 Exhibit 21, #27 Exhibit 22, #28 Exhibit 23)(Leung, Gary) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Unassigned. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Supplement) (Attorney Gary Y Leung added to party Securities & Exchange Commission(pty:pla)) (Leung, Gary) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Miller, Douglas) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Miller, Douglas) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attorney Douglas M Miller added to party Securities & Exchange Commission(pty:pla))(Miller, Douglas) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOWELL FAMILY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where Essex Capital Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David R Zaro

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Norman M Aspis