This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/04/2018 at 07:15:42 (UTC).

SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. GOLDMAN et al

Case Summary

On 09/05/2018 SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against GOLDMAN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are James B. Clark and Kevin McNulty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-13550

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James B. Clark

Presiding Judge

Kevin McNulty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION

Defendants

JEFFREY GOLDMAN

CHRISTOPHER EIKENBERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BARRY PATRICK O'CONNELL

Attorney at U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION

200 Vesey Street, Suite 400

New York, NY 10281

SIMONA K. SUH

Attorney at U.S. SECURITIES & EXCHANGE COMMISSION

Brookfield Place, 200 Vesey Street, Suite 400

New York, NY 10281

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. CHRISTOPHER EIKENBERRY waiver sent on 10/15/2018, answer due 12/14/2018. (SUH, SIMONA) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. JEFFREY GOLDMAN waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (SUH, SIMONA) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHRISTOPHER EIKENBERRY, JEFFREY GOLDMAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ek) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by BARRY PATRICK O'CONNELL on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (O'CONNELL, BARRY) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by SIMONA K. SUH on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (SUH, SIMONA) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CHRISTOPHER EIKENBERRY, JEFFREY GOLDMAN with JURY DEMAND, filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.(SUH, SIMONA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eu). (Entered: 09/05/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. CHRISTOPHER EIKENBERRY waiver sent on 10/15/2018, answer due 12/14/2018. (SUH, SIMONA) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. JEFFREY GOLDMAN waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (SUH, SIMONA) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHRISTOPHER EIKENBERRY, JEFFREY GOLDMAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ek) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, ) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by BARRY PATRICK O'CONNELL on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (O'CONNELL, BARRY) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by SIMONA K. SUH on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (SUH, SIMONA) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CHRISTOPHER EIKENBERRY, JEFFREY GOLDMAN with JURY DEMAND, filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.(SUH, SIMONA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eu). (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMONA K. SUH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barry Patrick O'Connell