This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2018 at 07:12:53 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commission v. Geraci

Case Summary

On 07/17/2018 Securities and Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Geraci. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John F. Keenan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-06432

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Keenan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendant

John Geraci

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc Peter Berger

Attorney at U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission (NY)

200 Vesey Street, Ste. 400

New York, NY 10281

Alison Rose Levine

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

200 Vesey Street, Suite 400

New York, NY 10281

Kevin Patrick McGrath

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

200 Vesey Street, Suite 400

New York, NY 10281

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Geraci. (dnh) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Geraci, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Levine, Alison) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Patrick McGrath on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (McGrath, Kevin) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/1/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John F. Keenan. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/18/2018) (mro) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alison Rose Levine on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Levine, Alison) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Berger, Marc) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against John Geraci. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Berger, Marc) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Geraci. (dnh) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Geraci, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Levine, Alison) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Patrick McGrath on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (McGrath, Kevin) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/1/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John F. Keenan. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/18/2018) (mro) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John F. Keenan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marc Peter Berger. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Fee Status code none (no fee required);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 1 (U.S. Government Plaintiff); the Fee Status code has been modified to wv (waived);. (jgo) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alison Rose Levine on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Levine, Alison) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Berger, Marc) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against John Geraci. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Berger, Marc) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alison R Levine

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Patrick McGrath

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc Peter Berger