This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:59:40 (UTC).

Secure Cam, LLC v. Babysense, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Secure Cam, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Babysense, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01523

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Secure Cam, LLC

Defendant

Babysense, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy Devlin

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm LLC

1306 North Broom Street, Suite 1

Wilmington, DE 19806

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Secure Cam, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to December 10, 2018 - filed by Secure Cam, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,257,158 B1. (nmg) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Babysense, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2472311.) - filed by Secure Cam, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Secure Cam, LLC. Babysense, LLC served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to December 10, 2018 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Babysense, LLC answer due 12/10/2018). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/19/2018. (dlw) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to December 10, 2018 - filed by Secure Cam, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Case Reassigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01523-MN, 1:18-cv-01524-MN (rjb) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01523-LPS, 1:18-cv-01524-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Secure Cam, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Secure Cam, LLC. Babysense, LLC served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Babysense, LLC on 10/3/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,257,158 B1. (nmg) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Babysense, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2472311.) - filed by Secure Cam, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.