This case was last updated from PACER on 02/08/2019 at 07:46:35 (UTC).

Sebren v. Harrison

Case Summary

On 12/10/2018 Sebren filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Harrison. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00667

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Sarah Sebren

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Casby Harrison, III

Providence, RI 02907

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Matthew H. Parker

Attorney at Whelan, Corrente, Flanders, Kinder & Siket LLP

100 Westminster Street, Suite 710

Providence, RI 02903

Robert Clark Corrente

Attorney at Whelan, Corrente, Flanders, Kinder & Siket LLP

100 Westminster Street, Suite 710

Providence, RI 02903

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Gerard M. DeCelles

1536 Westminster St., 272-8998, Fax: 272-4907

Providence, RI 02909

Casby Harrison, III

Attorney at Harrison Law Associates

807 Broad St., Suite 100

Providence, RI 02907

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Sebren. Casby Harrison, III served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (Parker, Matthew) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Casby Harrison, III, filed by Sarah Sebren.(Corrente, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#6

(#6) Defendant Harrison's ANSWER to Complaint of Sarah Sebren, COUNTERCLAIM against Sarah Sebren by Casby Harrison, III.(DeCelles, Gerard) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

#5

(#5) First MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Casby Harrison, III. Responses due by 1/28/2019. (Harrison, Casby) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Casby Harrison, III. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew H. Parker on behalf of Sarah Sebren (Parker, Matthew) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#2

(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1297610 ), filed by Sarah Sebren. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Corrente, Robert) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Sebren. Casby Harrison, III served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (Parker, Matthew) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Casby Harrison, III, filed by Sarah Sebren.(Corrente, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Defendant Harrison's ANSWER to Complaint of Sarah Sebren, COUNTERCLAIM against Sarah Sebren by Casby Harrison, III.(DeCelles, Gerard) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Reset Deadlines: Casby Harrison, III answer due 1/31/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/15/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) First MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Casby Harrison, III. Responses due by 1/28/2019. (Harrison, Casby) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Casby Harrison, III. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew H. Parker on behalf of Sarah Sebren (Parker, Matthew) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1297610 ), filed by Sarah Sebren. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Corrente, Robert) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/11/2018) (Potter, Carrie). (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1297610 ), filed by Sarah Sebren. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Corrente, Robert) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less