This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2018 at 07:46:14 (UTC).

Seattle SpinCo, Inc. et al v. Wapp Tech Limited Partnership et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2018 Seattle SpinCo, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Wapp Tech Limited Partnership. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01585

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Seattle SpinCo, Inc.

EntIT Software LLC

Defendants

Wapp Tech Corp.

Wapp Tech Limited Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephanie E. O'Byrne

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

David Ellis Moore

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

Bindu Ann George Palapura

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

Andrew Robb

Mark Reiter

Neema Jalali

Defendant Attorney

Timothy Devlin

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm LLC

1306 North Broom Street, Suite 1

Wilmington, DE 19806

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Exhibit A

#14

(#14) DECLARATION of Eileen Evans re #12 Answering Brief in Opposition, by EntIT Software LLC, Seattle SpinCo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moore, David) Modified on 12/12/2018 (nms). (Entered: 12/11/2018)

13 #1

Exhibit 1-13

#13

(#13) DECLARATION of Mark N. Reiter re #12 Answering Brief in Opposition, by EntIT Software LLC, Seattle SpinCo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-13)(Moore, David) Modified on 12/12/2018 (nms). (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#12

(#12) ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss, Transfer or Stay filed by EntIT Software LLC, Seattle SpinCo, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/18/2018. (Moore, David) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

11 #11

Exhibit 11

11 #10

Exhibit 10

11 #9

Exhibit 9

11 #7

Exhibit 7

11 #6

Exhibit 6

11 #5

Exhibit 5

11 #4

Exhibit 4

11 #3

Exhibit 3

11 #2

Exhibit 2

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#11

(#11) DECLARATION re #10 Opening Brief in Support, by Wapp Tech Corp., Wapp Tech Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Devlin, Timothy) Modified on 11/28/2018 (nms). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss, Transfer or Stay - filed by Wapp Tech Corp., Wapp Tech Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Devlin, Timothy) Modified on 11/28/2018 (nms). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) DECLARATION of Eileen Evans re #12 Answering Brief in Opposition, by EntIT Software LLC, Seattle SpinCo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moore, David) Modified on 12/12/2018 (nms). (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) DECLARATION of Mark N. Reiter re #12 Answering Brief in Opposition, by EntIT Software LLC, Seattle SpinCo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-13)(Moore, David) Modified on 12/12/2018 (nms). (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss, Transfer or Stay filed by EntIT Software LLC, Seattle SpinCo, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/18/2018. (Moore, David) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DECLARATION re #10 Opening Brief in Support, by Wapp Tech Corp., Wapp Tech Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Devlin, Timothy) Modified on 11/28/2018 (nms). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss, Transfer or Stay, filed by Wapp Tech Corp., Wapp Tech Limited Partnership.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/11/2018. (Devlin, Timothy) Modified on 11/28/2018 (nms). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss, Transfer or Stay - filed by Wapp Tech Corp., Wapp Tech Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Devlin, Timothy) Modified on 11/28/2018 (nms). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to November 27, 2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Wapp Tech Corp. answer due 11/27/2018; Wapp Tech Limited Partnership answer due 11/27/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/7/2018. (nms) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to November 27, 2018 - filed by Wapp Tech Corp., Wapp Tech Limited Partnership. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark Reiter, Neema Jalali, and Andrew Robb for EntIT Software LLC and Seattle SpinCo, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark Reiter, Neema Jalali, and Andrew Robb of Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP, filed by EntIT Software LLC, Seattle SpinCo, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/24/2018. (nms) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark Reiter, Neema Jalali, and Andrew Robb of Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP - filed by EntIT Software LLC, Seattle SpinCo, Inc.. (Palapura, Bindu) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seattle SpinCo, Inc., EntIT Software LLC. Wapp Tech Corp. served on 10/16/2018, answer due 11/6/2018. (Moore, David) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seattle SpinCo, Inc., EntIT Software LLC. Wapp Tech Limited Partnership served on 10/16/2018, answer due 11/6/2018. (Moore, David) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Wapp Tech Corp. on 10/16/2018; Wapp Tech Limited Partnership on 10/16/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Micro Focus International Plc. for EntIT Software LLC, Seattle SpinCo, Inc. filed by EntIT Software LLC, Seattle SpinCo, Inc. (nmg) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,971,678 B2 ;9,298,864 B2 ;8,924,192 B1. (nmg) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for DECLARATORY JUDGMENT filed with Jury Demand against Wapp Tech Corp., Wapp Tech Limited Partnership - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2481454.) - filed by Seattle SpinCo, Inc., EntIT Software LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H-AA, #4 Exhibit BB-MM, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wapp Tech Limited Partnership is a litigant

Latest cases where EntIT Software LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neema Jalali

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie E. O'Byrne