This case was last updated from PACER on 11/17/2018 at 07:42:41 (UTC).

Scroggins v. C&W Leasing Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2018 Scroggins filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against C W Leasing Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheryl H. Lipman and Charmiane G. Claxton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02640

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nathan Scroggins

Defendants

Earnest Owens

C&W Leasing Corporation

Huseman Logistics, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Jimmy Moore

Memphis, TN 38103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven Marshall

Attorney at REAVES LAW FIRM, PLLC

4466 Elvis Presley Blvd., Ste 310

Memphis, TN 38120

Defendant Attorneys

J. Britt Phillips

Attorney at SUTTER O'CONNELL

341 Cool Springs Blvd, Ste 430

Franklin, TN 37067

Christopher James Schroeck

Attorney at SUTTER O'CONNELL & FARCHIONE

341 Cool Springs Blvd., Ste. 430

Franklin, TN 37067

 

Court Documents

24 #1

Memorandum Memorandum in Support of MSJ

#24

(#24) Notice of Correction to #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of MSJ)(Schroeck, Christopher) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

23 #4

Exhibit Declaration of Vic Corley

23 #3

Statement of Undisputed Material Facts

23 #2

Exhibit Holliday v Epperson

23 #1

Memorandum Memorandum in Support of MSJ

#23

(#23) MOTION for Summary Judgment by C&W Leasing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of MSJ, #2 Exhibit Holliday v Epperson, #3 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Vic Corley)(Schroeck, Christopher) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#22

(#22) NOTICE by Nathan Scroggins Plaintiff's NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RULE 26(a)(1) INTIAL DISCLOSURES (Marshall, Steven) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#17

(#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by Nathan Scroggins.(Marshall, Steven) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Summons by Steven Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Marshall, Steven) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#9

(#9) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 10/23/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#4

(#4) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by C&W Leasing Corporation.(Phillips, J. Britt) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by C&W Leasing Corporation identifying Corporate Parent C&W Leasing Corporation for C&W Leasing Corporation.. (Phillips, J. Britt) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit discovery

1 #1

Exhibit Summons and Complaint

#1

(#5) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by C&W Leasing Corporation has been filed. For future reference, please note ECF Policies and Proceedures 10.1 electronic signature. Next time please make sure to use your s/signature on the civil cover sheet. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Notice of Correction to #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of MSJ)(Schroeck, Christopher) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION for Summary Judgment by C&W Leasing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of MSJ, #2 Exhibit Holliday v Epperson, #3 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Vic Corley)(Schroeck, Christopher) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE by Nathan Scroggins Plaintiff's NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RULE 26(a)(1) INTIAL DISCLOSURES (Marshall, Steven) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint by C&W Leasing Corporation.(Phillips, J. Britt) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/23/18. (shl) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Summons Issued as to Huseman Logistics, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Summons by Steven Marshall on behalf of Nathan Scroggins. (Marshall, Steven) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by Nathan Scroggins.(Marshall, Steven) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Monday, 11/18/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 11/1/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/25/2019. (tlh) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • (#15) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference held on 10/23/2018. Steven Marshall appearing for the Plaintiff. Christopher James Schroeck appearing for the Defendant. Deadlines/Dates established: Jury Trial set for Monday, 11/18/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial estimated to take 2-3 days. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 11/1/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/25/2019. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Mark Dodson)(9:00-9:17) (tlh) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Summons by Steven Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Marshall, Steven) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 10/23/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • (#8) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • (#7) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • (#6) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by C&W Leasing Corporation has been filed. For future reference, please note ECF Policies and Proceedures 10.1 electronic signature. Next time please make sure to use your s/signature on the civil cover sheet. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by C&W Leasing Corporation.(Phillips, J. Britt) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by C&W Leasing Corporation identifying Corporate Parent C&W Leasing Corporation for C&W Leasing Corporation.. (Phillips, J. Britt) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by C&W Leasing Corporation from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-003824-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2882187), filed by C&W Leasing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit discovery, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Phillips, J. Britt) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less