This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:00:56 (UTC).

Scott v. Mount et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Scott filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Mount. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert W. Gettleman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-05816

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Gettleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael T. Scott

Defendants

C.O. Ewing

C.O. Haynes

Capt. Mount

Travis Allen

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and one copy by Michael T. Scott (Exhibits). (Envelope not postmarked) (lf, ) . (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2018: #1 Envelope) (kp, ). (Entered: 08/28/2018)

1 #1

Envelope

#3

(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Michael T. Scott for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits) (lf, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#6

(#6) TRANSFERRED to the USDC Southern District of Illinois the electronic record. (sxb, ) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER: This action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois at East St. Louis for imposition of an initial filing fee and whatever other action the transferee court deems appropriate. The Clerk shall not issue summonses unless the transferee court so directs. The case and all pending motions are terminated on this Court's docket. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/24/2018. Mailed notice. (sxb, ) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (lf, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Michael T. Scott for attorney representation (lf, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • ELECTRONIC Acknowledgement of case transferred to the Southern District of Illinois as case 3:18-cv-01843, filed 10/09/2018. (kp, ) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TRANSFERRED to the USDC Southern District of Illinois the electronic record. (sxb, ) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: This action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois at East St. Louis for imposition of an initial filing fee and whatever other action the transferee court deems appropriate. The Clerk shall not issue summonses unless the transferee court so directs. The case and all pending motions are terminated on this Court's docket. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/24/2018. Mailed notice. (sxb, ) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Michael T. Scott for attorney representation (lf, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Michael T. Scott for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits) (lf, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (lf, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) RECEIVED Complaint and one copy by Michael T. Scott (Exhibits). (Envelope not postmarked) (lf, ) . (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2018: #1 Envelope) (kp, ). (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.