This case was last updated from PACER on 10/28/2018 at 07:57:09 (UTC).

Schubert et al v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 Schubert filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HSBC Bank USA, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas A Varlan and Debra C Poplin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00359

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas A Varlan

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William R Schubert

Delisa L. Simpson-Schubert

William R. Schubert

Defendants

HSBC Bank USA, N.A.

Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC

HSBC Bank USA, N.A. ACE Securities Corp. Home Equity Loan Trust

ACE Securities Corp. Home Equity Loan Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J Brent Nolan

Attorney at Nolan Law Firm

P O Box 1548

Knoxville, TN 37901

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin William Perry

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP (Nashville)

1600 Division Street, Suite 700, P.O. Box 340025

Nashville, TN 37203-0025

 

Court Documents

7 #3

Exhibit Notices of Default

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A - Pleadings

#11

(#11) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss - Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/10/2018. (KMK, ) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

7 #1

Exhibit Loan Modification

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Loan Modification, #2 Exhibit Correspondence related to default, #3 Exhibit Notices of Default)(Perry, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

1 #1

Other Civil Cover Sheet

#12

(#12) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information - Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/10/2018. (KMK, ) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#4

(#4) Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Notice of Removal : Please sign and date the Civil Cover Sheet and refile it in a non-fillable format using the event Supplement and link it back to the Notice of Removal. Requirements due by 9/4/2018. (CAT) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Corporate Interest by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. ACE Securities Corp. Home Equity Loan Trust identifying Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings plc, Corporate Parent HSBC USA Inc., Corporate Parent HSBC North American Holdings Inc. for HSBC Bank USA, N.A. ACE Securities Corp. Home Equity Loan Trust. (Perry, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#9

(#9) RELATED CASE ORDER - Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 9/07/2018. (KMK, ) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Perry, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to J. Brent Nolan. (c/m J. Brent Nolan The Nolan Law Firm P.O. Box 217 Powell, Tennessee 37849) (ADA) Modified on 9/24/2018 to note extension of the deadline. Mr. Nolan asked to submit additional documents. (ADA). (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#5

(#5) Informational Only - Administrative Notice to Counsel: Attorney J. Brent Nolan is not admitted in our district. (Copy of Notice mailed to J. Brent Nolan) (CAT) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anderson County Circuit Court, case number B8LA0117. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3757443), filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Pleadings)(Perry, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#13

(#13) CERTIFIED COPIES OF REMOVAL DOCUMENTS, received from Anderson County Circuit Court. (ADA) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#6

(#6) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Perry, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

7 #2

Exhibit Correspondence related to default

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CERTIFIED COPIES OF REMOVAL DOCUMENTS, received from Anderson County Circuit Court. (ADA) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information - Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/10/2018. (KMK, ) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss - Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/10/2018. (KMK, ) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Order Governing Depositions - Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/10/2018. (KMK, ) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RELATED CASE ORDER - Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 9/07/2018. (KMK, ) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (KMK, ) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to J. Brent Nolan. (c/m J. Brent Nolan The Nolan Law Firm P.O. Box 217 Powell, Tennessee 37849) (ADA) Modified on 9/24/2018 to note extension of the deadline. Mr. Nolan asked to submit additional documents. (ADA). (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Loan Modification, #2 Exhibit Correspondence related to default, #3 Exhibit Notices of Default)(Perry, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Perry, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Informational Only - Administrative Notice to Counsel: Attorney J. Brent Nolan is not admitted in our district. (Copy of Notice mailed to J. Brent Nolan) (CAT) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Notice of Removal : Please sign and date the Civil Cover Sheet and refile it in a non-fillable format using the event Supplement and link it back to the Notice of Removal. Requirements due by 9/4/2018. (CAT) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Poplin for related case determination. (CAT) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Corporate Interest by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. ACE Securities Corp. Home Equity Loan Trust identifying Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings plc, Corporate Parent HSBC USA Inc., Corporate Parent HSBC North American Holdings Inc. for HSBC Bank USA, N.A. ACE Securities Corp. Home Equity Loan Trust. (Perry, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Perry, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anderson County Circuit Court, case number B8LA0117. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3757443), filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Pleadings)(Perry, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.