This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:55:20 (UTC).

Schmallie v. Ryan et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Schmallie filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Ryan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frank R Zapata and Pro Se (Tucson). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00495

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank R Zapata

Referral Judge

Pro Se (Tucson)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leonard Schmallie

Tucson, AZ 85734

Defendants

John Mattos

Juli Roberts

Unknown Guinea

R Kepney

Monica Taylor

Rosa Basurto

D Martinez

B Brookhart

Carson McWilliams

Charles L Ryan

Meeghan Muse

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is granted. As required by the accompanying Order to the appropriate government agency, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $29.16. The Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 11/21/2018. (See attached Order for details) (KEP) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Leonard Schmallie. (2 pages). (BAC) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (BAC) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Leonard Schmallie. The Clerk of Court must serve by mail a copy of this Order on the Director of the Arizona Department of Corrections, 1601 West Jefferson, Phoenix, Arizona, 85007. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 11/21/2018. (See attached Order for details) (KEP) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Leonard Schmallie. (12 pages).(BAC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2018: #1 Envelope) (BAC). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Leonard Schmallie. The Clerk of Court must serve by mail a copy of this Order on the Director of the Arizona Department of Corrections, 1601 West Jefferson, Phoenix, Arizona, 85007. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 11/21/2018. (See attached Order for details) (KEP) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is granted. As required by the accompanying Order to the appropriate government agency, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $29.16. The Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 11/21/2018. (See attached Order for details) (KEP) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (BAC) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Leonard Schmallie. (8 pages). (BAC) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Leonard Schmallie. (2 pages). (BAC) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Leonard Schmallie. (12 pages).(BAC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2018: #1 Envelope) (BAC). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.