This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 07:54:35 (UTC).

Sawyer et al v. DDRTC Turkey Creek, LLC et al (PLR1)

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Sawyer filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DDRTC Turkey Creek, LLC PLR1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela L Reeves and H Bruce Guyton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00349

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela L Reeves

Referral Judge

H Bruce Guyton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Penney Sawyer

Jon Sawyer

Defendants

Jazzy Nail Bar, LLC

MRG Pizza-Tennessee, LLC d/b/a Blaze Pizza

DDRTC Turkey Creek, LLC

Smoky Mountain Creamery, Inc. d/b/a Marble Slab Turkey Creek

MRG Pizza-Tennessee, LLC

Smoky Mountain Creamery, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John M Neal

Attorney at Neal Law Firm

P O Box 51930

Knoxville, TN 37950

Defendant Attorney

Reuben N Pelot, IV

Attorney at Egerton, McAfee, Armistead & Davis, PC

P O Box 2047

Knoxville, TN 37901-2047

 

Court Documents

1 #4

Summons Jazzy Nail Bar, LLC

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jon Sawyer. MRG Pizza-Tennessee, LLC waiver sent on 9/19/2018. (Neal, John) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#2

(#2) Administrative Notice to Counsel: No action to be taken. For future reference, please file the Civil Cover Sheet and Summons in non-fillable form. (AMP) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

3 #2

Summons Jazzy Nail Bar, LLC

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3752399.), filed by Jon Sawyer, Penney Sawyer. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Summons DDRTC Turkey Creek, LLC, #3 Summons MRG Pizza-Tennessee, LLC, #4 Summons Jazzy Nail Bar, LLC, #5 Summons Smoky Mountain Creamery, Inc.)(Neal, John) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

1 #3

Summons MRG Pizza-Tennessee, LLC

1 #1

Other Civil Case Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Reuben N Pelot, IV on behalf of MRG Pizza-Tennessee, LLC (Pelot, Reuben) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 08/24/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

3 #1

Summons MRG Pizza-Tennessee, LLC

#6

(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 08/24/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

1 #5

Summons Smoky Mountain Creamery, Inc.

3 #3

Summons Smoky Mountain Creamery, Inc.

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jon Sawyer. DDRTC Turkey Creek, LLC waiver sent on 9/27/2018. (Neal, John) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to DDRTC Turkey Creek, LLC, Jazzy Nail Bar, LLC, MRG Pizza-Tennessee, LLC, and Smoky Mountain Creamery, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons MRG Pizza-Tennessee, LLC, #2 Summons Jazzy Nail Bar, LLC, #3 Summons Smoky Mountain Creamery, Inc.) (AMP) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

1 #2

Summons DDRTC Turkey Creek, LLC

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jon Sawyer. DDRTC Turkey Creek, LLC waiver sent on 9/27/2018. (Neal, John) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jon Sawyer. MRG Pizza-Tennessee, LLC waiver sent on 9/19/2018. (Neal, John) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Reuben N Pelot, IV on behalf of MRG Pizza-Tennessee, LLC (Pelot, Reuben) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 08/24/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 08/24/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 08/24/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to DDRTC Turkey Creek, LLC, Jazzy Nail Bar, LLC, MRG Pizza-Tennessee, LLC, and Smoky Mountain Creamery, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons MRG Pizza-Tennessee, LLC, #2 Summons Jazzy Nail Bar, LLC, #3 Summons Smoky Mountain Creamery, Inc.) (AMP) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Administrative Notice to Counsel: No action to be taken. For future reference, please file the Civil Cover Sheet and Summons in non-fillable form. (AMP) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AMP) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3752399.), filed by Jon Sawyer, Penney Sawyer. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Summons DDRTC Turkey Creek, LLC, #3 Summons MRG Pizza-Tennessee, LLC, #4 Summons Jazzy Nail Bar, LLC, #5 Summons Smoky Mountain Creamery, Inc.)(Neal, John) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.