Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/06/2019 at 08:07:59 (UTC).

Sauceda, et al. v. BNSF Railway Company, et al.

Case Summary

On 11/07/2018 Sauceda filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BNSF Railway Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lawrence J. O'Neill and Erica P. Grosjean. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01540

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence J. O'Neill

Referral Judge

Erica P. Grosjean

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dana Gray Sauceda

Ceres, CA 95307

David Gonzalez

Defendants

BNSF Railway Company

Center for Human Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Demetrios Papanikolas

Attorney at Oakwood Legal Group, LLP

470 S. San Vicente Blvd., 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie Quinn

Attorney at Murphy, Campbell, Alliston & Quinn

8801 Folsom Boulevard, Suite 230

Sacramento, CA 95826

Gary A. Campi

Attorney at Levangie Law Group

2021 N Street

Sacramento, CA 95811

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY Dana Gray Sauceda, Pro Se, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/19/18. Attorney Demetrios Papanikolas terminated.(Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

6 #1

Proof of Service

#6

(#6) SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Dana Gray Sauceda. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Papanikolas, Demetrios) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Quinn, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

4 #1

Proof of Service Proof of Service

#4

(#4) DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by David Gonzalez, Dana Gray Sauceda. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Papanikolas, Demetrios) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#3

(#3) CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by BNSF Railway Company. (Quinn, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

2 #3

VDRP

2 #2

Consent Form

2 #1

Standing Order

#2

(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Stanislaus, case number 2027561 by BNSF Railway Company. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7958800) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proof of Service)(Quinn, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY Dana Gray Sauceda, Pro Se, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/19/18. Attorney Demetrios Papanikolas terminated.(Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Dana Gray Sauceda. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Papanikolas, Demetrios) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Quinn, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by David Gonzalez, Dana Gray Sauceda. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Papanikolas, Demetrios) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by BNSF Railway Company. (Quinn, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Stanislaus, case number 2027561 by BNSF Railway Company. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7958800) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proof of Service)(Quinn, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BNSF Railway Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie Lynn Quinn