This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2018 at 07:40:50 (UTC).

Santos et al v. Carter et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 Santos filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Carter. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00114

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Miriam Tapari

Marilyn Santos

Defendants

Raymond Lee Dyals

Camden County Sheriff's Office

Christopher Joseph Prosen

Jim Proctor

Devon William Carter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Allen Bonner

255 Alhambra Circle, Penthouse

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Joseph J. Kalbac

Attorney at Colson Hicks Eidson

255 Alhambra Circle, Penthouse

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Stephanie A. Casey

Attorney at Colson Hicks Eidson

255 Alhambra Circle, Penthouse

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Francisco R. Maderal

Attorney at Colson Hicks Eidson

255 Alhambra Circle, Penthouse

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Lazaro Fields

Attorney at Colson Hicks Eidson

255 Alhambra Circle, Penthouse

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant Attorneys

Wesley Calvin Jackson

Attorney at Freeman, Mathis & Gary, LLP

100 Galleria Pkwy., Se, Suite 1600

Atlanta, GA 30339

Sun S. Choy

Attorney at Freeman, Mathis & Gary, LLP

100 Galleria Pkwy., Se, Suite 1600

Atlanta, GA 30339

Jacob D. Massee

Attorney at Oliver Maner, LLP

218 West State Street, P.O. Box 10186

Savannah, GA 31412-0386

Patrick T. O'Connor

Attorney at Oliver Maner, LLP

218 West State Street, P.O. Box 10186

Savannah, GA 31412-0386

Nathan T. Williams

Attorney at The Williams Litigation Group

P.O. 279

Brunswick, GA 31521

Bradley J. Watkins

Attorney at Brown, Readdick, Bumgartner, Carter, Strickland

P.O. Box 220, 5 Glynn Avenue

Brunswick, GA 31521-0220

Richard K. Strickland

Attorney at Brown, Readdick, Bumgartner, Carter, Strickland

P.O. Box 220, 5 Glynn Avenue

Brunswick, GA 31521-0220

 

Court Documents

36 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#36

(#36) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Marilyn Santos, Miriam Tapari. Responses due by 12/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fields, Lazaro) Modified on 11/20/2018 (slt). (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#35

(#35) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Christopher Joseph Prosen. (Massee, Jacob) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

34 #1

Exhibit A - Copy of Order from Willis v. McKoon

#34

(#34) MOTION to Dismiss by Christopher Joseph Prosen. Responses due by 11/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Order from Willis v. McKoon)(Massee, Jacob) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#33

(#33) ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Christopher Joseph Prosen answer due 11/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/15/2018. (ca) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#32

(#32) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley J. Watkins on behalf of Devon William Carter (Watkins, Bradley) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

28 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#28

MOTIONS REFERRED: #28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (slt) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#7

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darren J. Rousso. W. Allen Bonner has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Courts Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on October 1, 2018. (edd) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

5 #2

Text of Proposed Order

5 #1

Exhibit

#5

MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephanie A. Casey. (slt) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Marilyn Santos. (Bonner, William) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#3

(#3) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/24/18. (slt) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (ca) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#33) ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Christopher Joseph Prosen answer due 11/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/15/2018. (ca) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (slt) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Marilyn Santos, Miriam Tapari. Responses due by 12/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fields, Lazaro) Modified on 11/20/2018 (slt). (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Christopher Joseph Prosen. (Massee, Jacob) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) MOTION to Dismiss by Christopher Joseph Prosen. Responses due by 11/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Order from Willis v. McKoon)(Massee, Jacob) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Christopher Joseph Prosen answer due 11/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/15/2018. (ca) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley J. Watkins on behalf of Devon William Carter (Watkins, Bradley) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard K. Strickland on behalf of Devon William Carter (Strickland, Richard) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Devon William Carter. (Strickland, Richard) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint by Devon William Carter. (Strickland, Richard) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (slt) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darren J. Rousso. W. Allen Bonner has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Courts Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on October 1, 2018. (edd) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Darren J. Rousso, by Marilyn Santos, Miriam Tapari. Receipt Number 113J-2456515, Fee Amount $200. Responses due by 10/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Order of Admission)(Bonner, William) Modified on 10/1/2018 (slt). (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • (#6) TEXT ORDER granting 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Stephanie A. Casey. W. Allen Bonner has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Courts Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on October 1, 2018. (edd) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephanie A. Casey. (slt) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephanie A. Casey, by Marilyn Santos, Miriam Tapari. Receipt Number 113J-2455896, Fee Amount $200. Responses due by 10/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bonner, William) Modified on 10/1/2018 (slt). (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Marilyn Santos. (Bonner, William) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/24/18. (slt) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (ca) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 113J-2452325. (ca) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Marilyn Santos, Miriam Tapari. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less