This case was last updated from PACER on 11/06/2018 at 08:14:36 (UTC).

Sangret v. Greyhound Lines, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/07/2018 Sangret filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Greyhound Lines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dana L. Christensen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:18-CV-00157

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dana L. Christensen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barbara F. Sangret

Defendants

Does 1-10

Greyhound Lines, Inc.

Jefferson Partners Limited Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roland B. Durocher

Attorney at HARTELIUS, DUROCHER & WINTER, PC

Box 1629, 118 Th St. South

Great Falls, MT 59403-1629

Defendant Attorneys

James M. Duncan

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH, LLP

2929 North Central Avenue, Suite 1700

Phoenix, AZ 85012-2761

Jesse Beaudette

Attorney at BOHYER, ERICKSON, BEAUDETTE & TRANEL, P.C.

283 West Front Street, Suite 201, Po Box 7729

Missoula, MT 59807

Katie C. Guffin

Attorney at BOHYER, ERICKSON, BEAUDETTE & TRANEL, P.C.

283 West Front Street, Suite 201, Po Box 7729

Missoula, MT 59807

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Statement of Claim

3 #3

4_Summons

1 #1

State Court Complaint

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jefferson Partners Limited Partnership. (Guffin, Katie) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jefferson Partners Limited Partnership. (Guffin, Katie) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

3 #1

2_Summons

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (Duncan, James) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

3 #2

3_Summons

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT filed by Barbara F. Sangret in state court on 8/2/2018. (ASG) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

3 #4

5_Summons

#6

(#6) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (Duncan, James) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM James M. Duncan appearing for Defendant Greyhound Lines, Inc. (Duncan, James) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

3 #5

6_Amended Statement of Claim

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jefferson Partners Limited Partnership from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number DV-18-1085. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Statement of Claim, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ASG) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#10

(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (Duncan, James) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (Duncan, James) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Barbara F. Sangret. (Durocher, Roland) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jefferson Partners Limited Partnership. (Guffin, Katie) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (Duncan, James) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (Duncan, James) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM James M. Duncan appearing for Defendant Greyhound Lines, Inc. (Duncan, James) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT filed by Barbara F. Sangret in state court on 8/2/2018. (ASG) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of receipt of state court document. (Attachments: #1 2_Summons, #2 3_Summons, #3 4_Summons, #4 5_Summons, #5 6_Amended Statement of Claim) (ASG) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jefferson Partners Limited Partnership. (Guffin, Katie) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2191780. (ASG) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jefferson Partners Limited Partnership from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number DV-18-1085. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Statement of Claim, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ASG) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.