This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/09/2019 at 07:15:55 (UTC).

Sands v. Macmillan Publishers Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 Sands filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Macmillan Publishers Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alison J. Nathan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-11586

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alison J. Nathan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steve Sands

Defendant

Macmillan Publishers Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Anthony Dunne

Attorney at SRIPLAW, PLLC

11 Sunrise Plaza #305

Valley Stream, NY 11580

Richard Liebowitz

Attorney at Liebowitz Law Firm, PLLC

11 Sunrise Plaza, Suite 301, Suite 305

Valleystream, NY 11580

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher J. Robinson

Attorney at Rottenberg Lipman Rich PC

230 Park Avenue, Ste 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10169

Harry W. Lipman

Attorney at Rottenberg Lipman Rich PC

230 Park Avenue 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10169

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Macmillan Publishers Inc..(Robinson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#16

(#16) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent MacMillan Holdings LLC for Macmillan Publishers Inc.. Document filed by Macmillan Publishers Inc..(Robinson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher J. Robinson on behalf of Macmillan Publishers Inc.. (Robinson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion to Substitute Attorney. SO ORDERED. Added attorney Harry W. Lipman for Macmillan Publishers Inc. Attorney Christopher J. Robinson terminated (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/31/2019) (cf) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#13

(#13) LETTER MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Cahill Cossu Noh Robinson LLP, New Attorney: Rottenberg Lipman Rich PC addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christopher J. Robinson dated January 30, 2019. Document filed by Macmillan Publishers Inc..(Robinson, Christopher) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#12

(#12) REQUEST AND ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL granting #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. SO ORDERED. Attorney Joseph Anthony Dunne terminated. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/16/2019) (jca) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Joseph A. Dunne to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Steve Sands.(Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SO ORDERED. (Macmillan Publishers Inc. answer due 2/11/2019) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/7/2019) (jca) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#9

(#9) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christopher J. Robinson dated January 7, 2019. Document filed by Macmillan Publishers Inc..(Robinson, Christopher) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Macmillan Publishers Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steve Sands. (Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#2

(#2) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Macmillan Publishers Inc..(Robinson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Macmillan Publishers Inc..(Robinson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent MacMillan Holdings LLC for Macmillan Publishers Inc.. Document filed by Macmillan Publishers Inc..(Robinson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher J. Robinson on behalf of Macmillan Publishers Inc.. (Robinson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion to Substitute Attorney. SO ORDERED. Added attorney Harry W. Lipman for Macmillan Publishers Inc. Attorney Christopher J. Robinson terminated (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/31/2019) (cf) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) LETTER MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Cahill Cossu Noh Robinson LLP, New Attorney: Rottenberg Lipman Rich PC addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christopher J. Robinson dated January 30, 2019. Document filed by Macmillan Publishers Inc..(Robinson, Christopher) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REQUEST AND ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL granting #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. SO ORDERED. Attorney Joseph Anthony Dunne terminated. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/16/2019) (jca) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Joseph A. Dunne to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Steve Sands.(Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SO ORDERED. (Macmillan Publishers Inc. answer due 2/11/2019) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/7/2019) (jca) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christopher J. Robinson dated January 7, 2019. Document filed by Macmillan Publishers Inc..(Robinson, Christopher) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (jgo) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Macmillan Publishers Inc.. (jgo) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/26/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/13/2018) (cf) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Liebowitz on behalf of Steve Sands. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Macmillan Publishers Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steve Sands. (Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Macmillan Publishers Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16039638)Document filed by Steve Sands. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Macmillan Publishers Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harry W. Lipman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher John Robinson