This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 08:00:58 (UTC).

Sanchez v. Hwang

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Sanchez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Hwang. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathleen Cardone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00287

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen Cardone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ivan Sanchez

Defendants

Chiou Guey Hwang

Yin Shiong Hwang

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bill D. Hicks

Attorney at Ortega, McGlashan, Hicks & Perez PLLC

609 Myrtle, Suite 100

El Paso, TX 79901

Randolph Joseph Ortega

Attorney at Ellis & Ortega

609 Myrtle, Suite 100

El Paso, TX 79901

Defendant Attorney

Ruben S. Robles

Attorney at Robles, Bracken & Hughes

310 N. Mesa, Suite 700

El Paso, TX 79901

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER, ( Jury Selection set for 10/25/2019 08:30AM before Judge Kathleen Cardone, Jury Trial set for 10/25/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Kathleen Cardone, Status Conference set for 10/17/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Kathleen Cardone). Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Mediation Completed by 6/28/2019,Defendants Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2018,Defendants Amended Pleadings due by 4/3/2019, Discovery due by 5/31/2019, Plaintiffs Joinder of Parties due by 11/30/2018, Plaintiffs Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2019,Motions due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Service to Plaintiff of Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (bg2) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Randolph Joseph Ortega on behalf of Ivan Sanchez (Ortega, Randolph) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

1 #3

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) ORDER for the parties to submit a joint report of parties planning meeting by no later than November 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE Report of Parties' Planning Meeting by Yin Shiong Hwang (Robles, Ruben) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Randolph Joseph Ortega on behalf of Ivan Sanchez. Attorney Randolph Joseph Ortega added to party Ivan Sanchez(pty:pla) (Ortega, Randolph) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

1 #6

Fee Paid

1 #4

Index

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $400 receipt number 300032431), filed by Yin Shiong Hwang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Index, #5 Defendant's List of Counsel of Record, #6 Fee Paid)(bg2) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Defendant's R26 Initial Disclosures by Ruben S. Robles on behalf of Yin Shiong Hwang (Robles, Ruben) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

1 #5

Defendant's List of Counsel of Record

2 #1

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER, ( Jury Selection set for 10/25/2019 08:30AM before Judge Kathleen Cardone, Jury Trial set for 10/25/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Kathleen Cardone, Status Conference set for 10/17/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Kathleen Cardone). Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Mediation Completed by 6/28/2019,Defendants Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2018,Defendants Amended Pleadings due by 4/3/2019, Discovery due by 5/31/2019, Plaintiffs Joinder of Parties due by 11/30/2018, Plaintiffs Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2019,Motions due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE Report of Parties' Planning Meeting by Yin Shiong Hwang (Robles, Ruben) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER for the parties to submit a joint report of parties planning meeting by no later than November 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Defendant's R26 Initial Disclosures by Ruben S. Robles on behalf of Yin Shiong Hwang (Robles, Ruben) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Randolph Joseph Ortega on behalf of Ivan Sanchez (Ortega, Randolph) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Randolph Joseph Ortega on behalf of Ivan Sanchez. Attorney Randolph Joseph Ortega added to party Ivan Sanchez(pty:pla) (Ortega, Randolph) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Kathleen Cardone located at http://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/Rules/StandingOrders/default.asp#elpaso (bg2) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (bg2) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Service to Plaintiff of Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (bg2) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $400 receipt number 300032431), filed by Yin Shiong Hwang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Index, #5 Defendant's List of Counsel of Record, #6 Fee Paid)(bg2) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.