This case was last updated from PACER on 02/17/2019 at 08:09:09 (UTC).

SAM LEVIN, INC. v. RETAIL MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2018 SAM LEVIN, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RETAIL MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nora Barry Fischer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01682

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nora Barry Fischer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAM LEVIN, INC.

Defendants

RETAIL MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, INC.

AMIR MIRESKANDARI

MIRESCO INVESTMENT SERVICES INC.

DEREK CORVERS

DYNAMIC FURNITURE PROMOTIONS, INC.

MIRES, RAN, CLARK & ASSOCIATES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vincent M. Roskovensky

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC

301 Grant Street, One Oxford Centre, 14Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222-4895

Defendant Attorney

Henry M. Sneath

Attorney at Houston Harbaugh, P.C.

Three Gateway Center, 401 Liberty Avenue, 22Nd Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer,; that defendants AMIR MIRESKANDARI, MIRESCO INVESTMENT SERVICES INC., MIRES, RAN, CLARK & ASSOCIATES, INC., and RETAIL MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, INC.'s Answer to Complaint due 3/4/19. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/18/19. (jg) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#6

(#6) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by MIRES, RAN, CLARK & ASSOCIATES, INC., RETAIL MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, INC., AMIR MIRESKANDARI, MIRESCO INVESTMENT SERVICES INC. Answer due from MIRES, RAN, CLARK & ASSOCIATES, INC. on 3/4/2019; RETAIL MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, INC. on 3/4/2019; AMIR MIRESKANDARI on 3/4/2019; MIRESCO INVESTMENT SERVICES INC. on 3/4/2019. (Sneath, Henry) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Henry M. Sneath on behalf of MIRES, RAN, CLARK & ASSOCIATES, INC., MIRESCO INVESTMENT SERVICES INC., AMIR MIRESKANDARI, RETAIL MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, INC.. (Sneath, Henry) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/20/18. (jg) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to DEREK CORVERS, DYNAMIC FURNITURE PROMOTIONS, INC., MIRES, RAN, CLARK & ASSOCIATES, INC., MIRESCO INVESTMENT SERVICES INC., AMIR MIRESKANDARI, RETAIL MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, INC. (sdp) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DEREK CORVERS, DYNAMIC FURNITURE PROMOTIONS, INC., MIRES, RAN, CLARK & ASSOCIATES, INC., MIRESCO INVESTMENT SERVICES INC., AMIR MIRESKANDARI, RETAIL MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-4971356), filed by SAM LEVIN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G) (sdp) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer,; that defendants AMIR MIRESKANDARI, MIRESCO INVESTMENT SERVICES INC., MIRES, RAN, CLARK & ASSOCIATES, INC., and RETAIL MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, INC.'s Answer to Complaint due 3/4/19. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/18/19. (jg) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by MIRES, RAN, CLARK & ASSOCIATES, INC., RETAIL MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, INC., AMIR MIRESKANDARI, MIRESCO INVESTMENT SERVICES INC. Answer due from MIRES, RAN, CLARK & ASSOCIATES, INC. on 3/4/2019; RETAIL MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, INC. on 3/4/2019; AMIR MIRESKANDARI on 3/4/2019; MIRESCO INVESTMENT SERVICES INC. on 3/4/2019. (Sneath, Henry) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Henry M. Sneath on behalf of MIRES, RAN, CLARK & ASSOCIATES, INC., MIRESCO INVESTMENT SERVICES INC., AMIR MIRESKANDARI, RETAIL MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, INC.. (Sneath, Henry) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/20/18. (jg) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to DEREK CORVERS, DYNAMIC FURNITURE PROMOTIONS, INC., MIRES, RAN, CLARK & ASSOCIATES, INC., MIRESCO INVESTMENT SERVICES INC., AMIR MIRESKANDARI, RETAIL MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, INC. (sdp) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against DEREK CORVERS, DYNAMIC FURNITURE PROMOTIONS, INC., MIRES, RAN, CLARK & ASSOCIATES, INC., MIRESCO INVESTMENT SERVICES INC., AMIR MIRESKANDARI, RETAIL MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-4971356), filed by SAM LEVIN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G) (sdp) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less