This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Sallis v. Hiedemann et al

Case Summary

On 08/01/2018 Sallis filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Hiedemann. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William E Duffin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01179

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William E Duffin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dedrick B Sallis

Portage, WI 53901-0900

Defendants

CO Young

Lt Hiedemann

CO Lunde

Donna Larson

CO Moungey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Letters from Counsel

#10

(#10) ORDER that on or before 9/6/2018 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 5.53 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 8/16/2018. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, Warden via USPS)(mlm)

#7

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT with jury demand filed against all Defendants by Dedrick B Sallis. (tlf)

#13

(#13) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/14/2018 granting #11 Plaintiff Dedrick B Sallis's Motion to use his release account to pay the initial partial filing fee; denying as moot #12 Motion. Sallis must pay the initial partial filing fee by 10/5/2018. The agency having custody of him shall withdraw $5.53 from his release account and forward that sum to the clerk of court as the initial partial filing fee within twenty-one days of this order. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff and Warden-Columbia Corr Inst) (lz)

#5

(#5) LETTER from the Clerk to Dedrick B Sallis requesting that he submit the consent/refusal form for Magistrate Judge William E Duffin within 21 days. Plaintiff must also submit his six-month certified trust account statement. (tlf)

#8

RESTRICTED

11 #1

Information Requests

6 #1

Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Dedrick B Sallis. (tlf)

#6

(#6) LETTER from the Clerk to Dedrick B Sallis regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)

9 #1

Exhibits 1-4 (with bookmarks)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Dedrick B Sallis. (Attachments: #1 Letters from Counsel)(tlf)

#12

(#12) Second MOTION to pay initial partial filing fee from release account by Dedrick B Sallis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(mac)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $5.53, receipt number MK4689-074058. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/14/2018 granting #11 Plaintiff Dedrick B Sallis's Motion to use his release account to pay the initial partial filing fee; denying as moot #12 Motion. Sallis must pay the initial partial filing fee by 10/5/2018. The agency having custody of him shall withdraw $5.53 from his release account and forward that sum to the clerk of court as the initial partial filing fee within twenty-one days of this order. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff and Warden-Columbia Corr Inst) (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Second MOTION to pay initial partial filing fee from release account by Dedrick B Sallis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to pay initial partial filing fee from release account by Dedrick B Sallis. (Attachments: #1 Information Requests)(tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER that on or before 9/6/2018 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 5.53 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 8/16/2018. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, Warden via USPS)(mlm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REQUEST by Dedrick B Sallis to include Exhibits 1-4 with his #1 Prisoner Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4 (with bookmarks))(tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Dedrick B Sallis. (tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Dedrick B Sallis. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LETTER from the Clerk to Dedrick B Sallis regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER from the Clerk to Dedrick B Sallis requesting that he submit the consent/refusal form for Magistrate Judge William E Duffin within 21 days. Plaintiff must also submit his six-month certified trust account statement. (tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Dedrick B Sallis. (Attachments: #1 Letters from Counsel)(tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Dedrick B Sallis. (Note: Statement only covers a 7-day period.) (tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Dedrick B Sallis. (tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT with jury demand filed against all Defendants by Dedrick B Sallis. (tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.