This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:13:19 (UTC).

Saint-Gobain Ceramics and Plastics, Inc. v. II-VI Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Saint-Gobain Ceramics and Plastics, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against II-VI Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shashi H. Kewalramani and Christina A. Snyder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-01798

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

Presiding Judge

Christina A. Snyder

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.

Saint-Gobain Ceramics and Plastics, Inc.

Defendants

II-VI Optical Systems, Inc.

II-VI Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jack W Londen

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

Ryan James Malloy

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 6000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3543

Defendant Attorneys

Amy J Coles

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

501 Grant Street Suite 850

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Keith A Rutherford

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Avenue Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Salvatore P Tamburo

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

1825 Eye Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Cheryl S Chang

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

#1

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.. (Londen, Jack) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.. (Londen, Jack) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc., identifying Compagnie de Saint Gobain S.A.. (Londen, Jack) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc. identifying Compagnie de Saint-Gobain S.A. as Corporate Parent. (Londen, Jack) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.. (Londen, Jack) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.. (Londen, Jack) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#76

(#76) SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS under seal #75 filed by Defendants II-VI Inc., II-VI Optical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document)(Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#77

(#77) Certificate of Service filed by Defendants II-VI Inc., II-VI Optical Systems, Inc. re: Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration #76 (Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#75

(#75) APPLICATION to file document REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS under seal filed by Defendants II-VI Inc., II-VI Optical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document)(Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

75 #2

Redacted Document

75 #1

Proposed Order

#74

(#74) RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #36 (REDACTED Version of Response Proposed to be Filed Under Seal) filed by Defendants II-VI Inc., II-VI Optical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Salvatore Tamburo)(Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

36 #5

Proposed Order

36 #4

Declaration of Salvatore Tamburo

36 #3

Redacted Document Decl of Sandra Lucero

153 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#77) Certificate of Service filed by Defendants II-VI Inc., II-VI Optical Systems, Inc. re: Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration #76 (Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#76) SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS under seal #75 filed by Defendants II-VI Inc., II-VI Optical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document)(Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) APPLICATION to file document REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS under seal filed by Defendants II-VI Inc., II-VI Optical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document)(Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #36 (REDACTED Version of Response Proposed to be Filed Under Seal) filed by Defendants II-VI Inc., II-VI Optical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Salvatore Tamburo)(Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#73) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Saint-Gobain Ceramics and Plastics, Inc., re Sealed Opposition #72 served on 10/22/2018. (Malloy, Ryan) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) SEALED OPPOSITION RE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #36 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #68 filed by Plaintiff Saint-Gobain Ceramics and Plastics, Inc..(Malloy, Ryan) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #55 . On October 16, 2018, the parties jointly filed a stipulation to continue the hearing for plaintiffs preliminary injunctionmotion to December 3, 2018. Dkt 63. The Court granted the stipulation onOctober 18, 2018. Dkt. 69. In light of the stipulation, defendants application for the stay appears to be moot.The hearing for plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction is now scheduled for December 3, 2018, whereas defendants motion to dismiss remains scheduled fo November 5, 2018. Because it is unclear what remaining disputes exist on this issue, the Court sets atelephonic status conference for Monday, October 22, 2018 at 11:00 PST, at which the parties can clarify their positions. All parties are ordered to discuss the matter with their clients and opposing counsel prior to the telephone conference. Counsel for PLAINTIFF is ordered to initiate the telephone conference call THROUGH THE TELEPHONE OPERATOR to include all counsel of record, and CHAMBERS. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR OTHER SPECIFICS AND INSTRUCTIONS THEREIN). (lc) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) GRANTING DEFENDANTS II-VI INC. AND II-VI OPTICAL SYSTEMS, INC.S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PERMANENTLY SEALING DOCUMENT INADVERTENTLY PUBLICLY FILED ON OCTOBER15, 2018 #66 by Judge Christina A. Snyder (lc) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIONMOTION AND EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE REPLY BRIEF #64 by Judge Christina A. Snyder:Plaintiff Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.s reply in supportof its PI Motion will be due on November 19, 2018, and the hearing on thePI Motion will be continued to December 3, 2018, at 10:00 A.M. #7 . (lc) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) REPLY in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Staying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Pending Determination of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #55 filed by Defendants II-VI Inc., II-VI Optical Systems, Inc.. (Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DECLARATION of John W. Locher in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Patent Infringement by II-VI Inc. and II-VI Optical Systems, Inc. Motion #7 filed by Plaintiff Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.. (Londen, Jack) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #8 filed by Plaintiff Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document (Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction), #2 Redacted Document (Declaration of Michael E. Cahill in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction))(Londen, Jack) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document (Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction), #3 Redacted Document (Declaration of Michael E. Cahill in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction))(Londen, Jack) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Patent Infringement by II-VI Inc. and II-VI Optical Systems, Inc. Motion filed by Plaintiff Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/28/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Unassigned. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Londen, Jack) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.. (Londen, Jack) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.. (Londen, Jack) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc. identifying Compagnie de Saint-Gobain S.A. as Corporate Parent. (Londen, Jack) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc., identifying Compagnie de Saint Gobain S.A.. (Londen, Jack) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.. (Londen, Jack) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22314894 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Jack W Londen added to party Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.(pty:pla))(Londen, Jack) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.