This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/17/2021 at 20:42:56 (UTC).

Sage Therapeutics, Inc. v. Sage Naturals, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/13/2017 Sage Therapeutics, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Sage Naturals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nathaniel M. Gorton and Richard G. Stearns. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-11089

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Nathaniel M. Gorton

Richard G. Stearns

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Sage Therapeutics, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Sage Naturals, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Judge Edward F. Harrington

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Brandon T. Scruggs

Lisa M. Tittemore

Sharona H. Sternberg

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Brian Michaelis

 

Court Documents

#43

#42

#40

#39

38 #1

Exhibit 1 - Proposed Stipulated Protective Order

#38

36 #2

Standing Order re Default PO

36 #1

Standing Order Re Courtsey Copies

#36

#10

#8

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #2

Category Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sage Therapeutics, Inc. (Sternberg, Sharona) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #40 Motion to Stay all deadlines until 4/9/2018 upon parties' representation that they are close to completing a settlement. Parties to file dismissal or joint status report by that date. (RGS, int2) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Joint MOTION to Stay (Suspend Case Deadlines Pending Settlement Compliance) by Sage Therapeutics, Inc..(Scruggs, Brandon) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting #38 Motion for Protective Order pursuant to the parties' joint stipulation. (RGS, int2) (Entered: 01/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Sage Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Scruggs, Brandon) (Entered: 01/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ANSWER to Counterclaim by Sage Therapeutics, Inc..(Tittemore, Lisa) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial disclosures to be exchanged no later than 1/3/2018; joint proposed protective order due 1/31/2018; amended pleadings and joinder of parties due by 2/28/2018. Fact discovery to be completed by 5/16/2018. If experts are utilized, opening reports due 6/13/2018; rebuttal reports 7/11/2018; expert discovery closes 8/8/2018; summary judgment motions to be filed no later than 9/5/2018. If experts are not utilized, summary judgment motions to be filed no later than 6/13/2018. Summary judgment oppositions to be filed no later than 21 days after the motion, reply by leave of court only. The parties to inform the court no later than 6/13/2018 (if summary judgment motions are not filed on that date) whether they intend to utilize experts.(RGS, int2) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Sage Therapeutics, Inc. by Sage Naturals, Inc..(Michaelis, Brian) (Entered: 12/08/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketSenior Judge Edward F. Harrington: The parties notified the Court that this case is not ripe for mediation at this time and want to cancel the mediation. ORDER entered. (McLaughlin, Tracy) (Entered: 11/29/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Sage Naturals, Inc..(Michaelis, Brian) (Entered: 08/28/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Reassignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. (adminn, ) (Entered: 08/08/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Lima, Christine) (Entered: 08/08/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Sage Naturals, Inc. answer due 8/28/2017. (Caruso, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/08/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First MOTION for Extension of Time to August 28, 2017 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Assented-to) by Sage Naturals, Inc..(Michaelis, Brian) (Entered: 08/07/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sage Therapeutics, Inc.. Sage Naturals, Inc. waiver sent on 6/13/2017, answer due 8/14/2017. (Scruggs, Brandon) (Entered: 06/27/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Sage Naturals, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 06/13/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (McKillop, Matthew) (Entered: 06/13/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sage Therapeutics, Inc.. (Tittemore, Lisa) (Entered: 06/13/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sage Naturals, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6670185 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Sage Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Tittemore, Lisa) (Entered: 06/13/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less