This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2018 at 07:55:28 (UTC).

Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 Safeco Insurance Company of America filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Electrolux Home Products, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Curtis L Collier and Clifton L Corker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00120

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Curtis L Collier

Referral Judge

Clifton L Corker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Safeco Insurance Company of America, as subrogee of Janice Bradley

Safeco Insurance Company of America

Defendant

Electrolux Home Products, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeremy L Jones

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor (Charlotte)

One Wachovia Center, 301 South College Street, Suite 2100

Charlotte, NC 28202

Zachary V Renegar

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor (Charlotte)

One Wachovia Center, 301 South College Street, Suite 2100

Charlotte, NC 28202

Defendant Attorney

Frankie Neil Spero

Attorney at Bradley, Arant, Boult, Cummings LLP (Nashville)

1600 Division Street, Suite 700

Nashville, TN 37203

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/26/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#14

(#14) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Spero, Frankie) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Continue: Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2018 03:00 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Curtis L Collier. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/30/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Spero, Frankie) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#11

(#11) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Renegar, Zachary) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 08/21/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

9 #3

Other Envelope

9 #2

Other Cover Letter

9 #1

Other Certificate of Good Standing

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Zachary V Renegar (Filing fee $ 90.00 Receipt Number G2011050) by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (CAT) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2018 at 1:30 PM in the Knoxville Video Conference Room before District Judge Curtis L Collier. (CBS) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

7 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent

#7

(#7) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/1/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

#6

(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/1/18. (ABF) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/1/18. (ABF) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/1/18. (ABF) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Electrolux Home Products, Inc..(Spero, Frankie) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Spero, Frankie) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/26/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Spero, Frankie) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge as required by prior court order. (AMP) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Continue: Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2018 03:00 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Curtis L Collier. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/30/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Spero, Frankie) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Renegar, Zachary) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 08/21/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete Zachary V Renegar regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00 Receipt Number G2011050) filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America (CAT) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Zachary V Renegar (Filing fee $ 90.00 Receipt Number G2011050) by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (CAT) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2018 at 1:30 PM in the Knoxville Video Conference Room before District Judge Curtis L Collier. (CBS) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/1/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/1/18. (ABF) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/1/18. (ABF) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/1/18. (ABF) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (ABF) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Electrolux Home Products, Inc..(Spero, Frankie) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Spero, Frankie) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Greene County, TN, case number CC-18-CV-274 AEP. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3731620), filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Filings, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Spero, Frankie) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less