This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2018 at 14:48:59 (UTC).

In Re: Sabine Oil & Gas Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/29/2016 In Re Sabine Oil Gas Corporation was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Koeltl. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:16-CV-06054

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Appellant

Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors

Appellees and Debtors

Sabine Oil & Gas Corporation

Barclays Bank PLC

Duane Radtke

James Lightner

Sabine Investor Holdings LLC

Loren Carroll

David Sambrooks

Barclays Capital Inc.

James Lee

First Reserve GP XI, L.P.

Alex Krueger

Wilmington Trust, N.A.

Patrick R. McDonald

Victor Wind

Joshua Weiner

FRC Founders Corporation

Brooks Shughart

Michael France

Dod Fraser

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Justin Florence

Gregg Mattisen Galardi(Designation Retained)

Mark Rodney Somerstein(Designation Retained)

Keith Howard Wofford(Designation Retained)

Debtor Attorneys

Ryan Blaine Bennett

Adrianne Katrine Jakola

Devon M. Largio

Appellee Attorneys

Joseph John Frank(Designation Retained)

Theresa Ann Foudy(Designation Retained)

Kevin Arthur Meehan(Designation Retained)

Kenneth R. David(Designation Retained)

Susheel Kirpalani(Designation Retained)

Andrew J. Rossman(Designation Retained)

Paul Basta(Designation Retained)

Ryan Blaine Bennett(Designation Retained)

Adrianne Katrine Jakola(Designation Retained)

Devon M. Largio(Designation Retained)

Kyle James Kimpler(Designation Retained)

Moses Silverman(Designation Retained)

Other Attorneys

Margot B. Schonholtz(Designation Retained)

16 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#65

(#65) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 42 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sabine Oil & Gas Corporation. The motion to dismiss, (ECF No. 42), is granted. (As further set forth in this Memorandum Opinion and Order.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/3/2017) (mro)

#61

(#61) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court has considered all of the arguments of the parties. To the extent not specifically discussed above, the arguments are either moot or without merit. The motion to certify the direct appeal to the Court of Appeals is denied. SO ORDERED. re: 46 MOTION for Leave to Appeal Motion to Certify for Direct Appeal filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/24/2016) (rjm)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 42 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sabine Oil & Gas Corporation. The motion to dismiss, (ECF No. 42), is granted. (As further set forth in this Memorandum Opinion and Order.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/3/2017) (mro)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court has considered all of the arguments of the parties. To the extent not specifically discussed above, the arguments are either moot or without merit. The motion to certify the direct appeal to the Court of Appeals is denied. SO ORDERED. re: 46 MOTION for Leave to Appeal Motion to Certify for Direct Appeal filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/24/2016) (rjm)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRC Founders Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Sabine Oil & Gas Corporation is a litigant