This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2018 at 07:02:39 (UTC).

Saada et al v. Golan

Case Summary

On 09/20/2018 Saada filed an Other lawsuit against Golan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven M. Gold and Ann M Donnelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-05292

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Steven M. Gold

Presiding Judge

Ann M Donnelly

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Isacco Jacky Saada

Respondent

Narkis Aliza Golan

In Re

In The Matter of B.A.S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Robert D. Arenstein

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert D. Arenstein

295 Madison Avenue, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Richard Min

Attorney at Camhi & Min LLP

420 Lexington Avenue, Suite 300

New York, NY 10170

Respondent Attorneys

Karen King

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Alex Michael Hyman

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Claudia Hammerman

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Marissa Doran

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Daniel H. Levi

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Farrison

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

32 #3

Exhibit C

32 #2

Exhibit B

32 #1

Exhibit A

#32

31 #4

Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law

31 #3

Exhibit C - Photos

31 #2

Exhibit B - Deleted Whatsapp

31 #1

Exhibit A - Police Report

#31

#8

#6

#7

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2018
  • SCHEDULING ORDER: The December 14, 2018 deadline to file a statement of stipulated facts; a list of witnesses with a brief narrative statement of the expected testimony of each witness; and a list of exhibits to be offered into evidence, a one-sentence description of each exhibit, and the basis for any objections to the admissibility of any exhibits is extended to December 17, 2018. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 11/15/2018. (Alsarraf, Ali) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #32 Request to Permit Expert to Interview Child: Dr. Stephanie Brandt is permitted to interview B.A.S. as part of her evaluation. The parties agreed to work out the logistics for the interview(s). Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 11/15/2018. (Alsarraf, Ali) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ann M. Donnelly: Status Conference held on 11/15/2018. Richard Min appeared for the petitioner. Karen King, Daniel Levi, and Phoebe King appeared for the respondent. Case called, discussions held. See separate order issuing from these proceedings. (Court Reporter Linda Marino.) (Alsarraf, Ali) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Letter MOTION to Appoint Expert -- Letter dated November 13, 2018 requesting the Court to permit Dr. Stephanie Brandt to interview the Child by Narkis Aliza Golan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Levi, Daniel) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) REPLY in Support of Petition filed by Isacco Jacky Saada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Police Report, #2 Exhibit B - Deleted Whatsapp, #3 Exhibit C - Photos, #4 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law) (Min, Richard) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel H. Levi on behalf of Narkis Aliza Golan (aty to be noticed) (Levi, Daniel) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • RESCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a change in the Courts schedule the status conference set for 11/15/2018 at 11:30 a.m. will be held at 10:00 a.m, in Courtroom 4G North. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 11/2/2018. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: The parties are to meet and confer regarding case management, including facts or issues that may be the subject of stipulation and the exchange of relevant documents. The petitioner's reply to the respondent's opposition #26 is due by November 6, 2018. A status conference is set for Thursday, November 15, 2018, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 4G North. Trial is set for Monday, January 7, 2019. A final pre-trial conference is set for Thursday, January 3, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 4G North. By Wednesday, November 14, 2018, the parties are to identify any experts that they expect to call at trial. By Friday, December 14, 2018, the parties are to file a statement of stipulated facts; a list of witnesses with a brief narrative statement of the expected testimony of each witness; and a list of exhibits to be offered into evidence, a one-sentence description of each exhibit, and the basis for any objections to the admissibility of any exhibits. By Friday, December 21, 2018, the parties are to file proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law, and all exhibits must be pre-marked for the trial and exchanged with the other parties. By Friday, December 28, 2018, the parties are to deliver 3 courtesy copies of all pre-marked trial exhibits. Ordered by Judge Ann M Donnelly on 10/25/2018. (Tuminelli, Amanda) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) EXHIBIT B and C to the Mario Kravchenko Declaration by Narkis Aliza Golan. Related document: #23 Declaration filed by Narkis Aliza Golan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (King, Karen) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) EXHIBIT G and I to the Narkis Golan Declaration by Narkis Aliza Golan. Related document: #20 Declaration, filed by Narkis Aliza Golan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (King, Karen) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Karen King on behalf of Narkis Aliza Golan (aty to be noticed) (King, Karen) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Min on behalf of Isacco Jacky Saada (aty to be noticed) (Min, Richard) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: An Order of this Court having issued on September 20, 2018, directing that the Respondent surrender passports for both herself and infant B.A.S., to the Clerk of Court, and the Clerk of Court having indicated the Clerk's Office is not in receipt of such passports, the United States Marshals Service is directed to use the resources it has available to locate and serve Respondent and seize the passports of Respondent and B.A.S. for safekeeping pending a further determination by this Court. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 10/10/2018. (Alsarraf, Ali) (Greene, Donna). (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ann M. Donnelly:Show Cause Hearing held on 9/24/2018. Robert Arenstein and Richard Min appeared for the petitioner. The respondent's attorney was not present; the respondent appeared for herself. Case called, discussions held. The hearing is re-scheduled for Monday, October 15, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 4GN. The respondent is to turn in her and her child's passports to the Clerk's Office by Wednesday, September 26, 2018, pending a determination on the petition. (Court Reporter Michele Nardone.) (Alsarraf, Ali) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause. Respondent is hereby directed to show cause before this Court on 9/24/2018 at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 4G North, as to why an order should not be made and entered granting the petitioner the relief requested in the attached. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 9/20/2018. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653132488 (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Narkis Aliza Golan. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Unsigned Order to Show Cause by Isacco Jacky Saada (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (Petition For Return of the Child) against Narkis Aliza Golan, filed by Isacco Jacky Saada. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly) . (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Claudia Hammerman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex Michael Hyman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen King Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel H. Levi