This case was last updated from PACER on 11/30/2018 at 07:39:20 (UTC).

Rutland v. AutoNation, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2018 Rutland filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against AutoNation, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Diane K. Vescovo and Mark S. Norris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02682

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

Presiding Judge

Mark S. Norris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angela Rutland

Defendant

AutoNation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin Gilbert

Attorney at GILBERT MCWHERTER SCOTT BOBBTT PLC

341 Cool Springs Blvd., Suite 230

Franklin, TN 37067

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Elton Dezort, Jr.

Attorney at FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP

9150 South Hills Blvd, Suite 300

Cleveland, OH 44147

Gabriel Paul Eaton McGaha

Attorney at FISHER & PHILLIPS, LLP - Memphis

1715 Aaron Brenner Drive, Suite 312

Memphis, TN 38120

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Mark S. Norris for all further proceedings. Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr on 11/26/2018. (jae) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#12

(#12) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Proposed Order Submitted) by AutoNation, Inc.. (McGaha, Gabriel) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#11

(#11) NOTICE by AutoNation, Inc. (Notice of Appearance for Robert Dezort) (Dezort, Robert) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting DE #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 10/29/2018. (Fowlkes, John) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint - proposed order submitted by AutoNation, Inc.. (McGaha, Gabriel) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel Paul Eaton McGaha on behalf of AutoNation, Inc. (McGaha, Gabriel) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

7 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2-- Return Mail Receipt

7 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1-- Affidavit of Service

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Rutland as to AutoNation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-- Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-- Return Mail Receipt)(Gilbert, Justin) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to AutoNation, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#2

(#2) Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AutoNation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2892496), filed by Angela Rutland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Gilbert, Justin) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Mark S. Norris for all further proceedings. Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr on 11/26/2018. (jae) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Proposed Order Submitted) by AutoNation, Inc.. (McGaha, Gabriel) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE by AutoNation, Inc. (Notice of Appearance for Robert Dezort) (Dezort, Robert) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting DE #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 10/29/2018. (Fowlkes, John) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint - proposed order submitted by AutoNation, Inc.. (McGaha, Gabriel) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel Paul Eaton McGaha on behalf of AutoNation, Inc. (McGaha, Gabriel) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Rutland as to AutoNation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-- Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-- Return Mail Receipt)(Gilbert, Justin) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to AutoNation, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against AutoNation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2892496), filed by Angela Rutland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Gilbert, Justin) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less