This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 13:00:02 (UTC).

Rustic Woodworks, Inc. v. Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/18/2018 Rustic Woodworks, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard P. Matsch. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01827

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard P. Matsch

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rustic Woodworks, Inc. d/b/a Vaussa

Rustic Woodworks, Inc.

Rustic Woodworks, Inc. a Colorado Corporation doing business as Vaussa

Defendant

Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew M. Holycross

Attorney at Springer & Steinberg, P.C.

1600 Broadway, Suite 1200

Denver, CO 80202-4920

Aaron Cartwright Acker

Attorney at Springer & Steinberg, P.C.

1600 Broadway, Suite 1200

Denver, CO 80202-4920

Defendant Attorney

Evan P. Lee

Attorney at Morgan Rider Riter Tsai, P.C.

1512 Larimer Street, Suite 450

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Lee, Evan) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Aaron Cartwright Acker on behalf of Rustic Woodworks, Inc.Attorney Aaron Cartwright Acker added to party Rustic Woodworks, Inc.(pty:pla) (Acker, Aaron) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew M. Holycross on behalf of Rustic Woodworks, Inc.Attorney Matthew M. Holycross added to party Rustic Woodworks, Inc.(pty:pla) (Holycross, Matthew) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

#9

(#9) PROCEDURAL ORDER NUMBER ONE Counsel will meet and confer as required by Rule 26 (f)(2) within 30 days from the date of this order. Lead counsel shall attend the conference in person. The disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1)(A) shall be made within 14 days after that conference. Counsel for the plaintiff will telephone chambers [303-844-4627] within 10 days after the disclosures to set a date and time for a Scheduling Conference pursuant to Rule 16. The instructions for preparation of the Scheduling Order and the form of that order are found at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/judges/judges.aspx. ORDERED that counsel file disclosure statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/26/2018. (ktera) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company.(Lee, Evan) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

#7

(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, ) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

#5

(#5) STATE COURT ORDER re: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Routt County District Court Judge Shelley Ann Hill on 07/10/2018. (rvill, ) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company on 06/19/2018. (rvill, ) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Rustic Woodworks, Inc.(rvill, ) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

1 #14

Exhibit L - Proposed Order re Motion for Extension

1 #12

Exhibit J - Summons

1 #11

Exhibit I - State Docket

1 #10

Exhibit H - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #9

Exhibit G - Affidavit of EPL

1 #8

Exhibit F - Division of Insurance

1 #7

Exhibit E - Secretary of State

1 #5

Exhibit C - Letter

1 #4

Exhibit B - Complaint

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Lee, Evan) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Aaron Cartwright Acker on behalf of Rustic Woodworks, Inc.Attorney Aaron Cartwright Acker added to party Rustic Woodworks, Inc.(pty:pla) (Acker, Aaron) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew M. Holycross on behalf of Rustic Woodworks, Inc.Attorney Matthew M. Holycross added to party Rustic Woodworks, Inc.(pty:pla) (Holycross, Matthew) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROCEDURAL ORDER NUMBER ONE Counsel will meet and confer as required by Rule 26 (f)(2) within 30 days from the date of this order. Lead counsel shall attend the conference in person. The disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1)(A) shall be made within 14 days after that conference. Counsel for the plaintiff will telephone chambers [303-844-4627] within 10 days after the disclosures to set a date and time for a Scheduling Conference pursuant to Rule 16. The instructions for preparation of the Scheduling Order and the form of that order are found at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/judges/judges.aspx. ORDERED that counsel file disclosure statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/26/2018. (ktera) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company.(Lee, Evan) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, ) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • (#6) Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATE COURT ORDER re: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Routt County District Court Judge Shelley Ann Hill on 07/10/2018. (rvill, ) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company on 06/19/2018. (rvill, ) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Rustic Woodworks, Inc.(rvill, ) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • (#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, ) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company from District Court, Routt County, Colorado, Case Number 2018CV30046. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6203169), filed by Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Return of Service, #4 Exhibit B - Complaint, #5 Exhibit C - Letter, #6 Exhibit D - Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit E - Secretary of State, #8 Exhibit F - Division of Insurance, #9 Exhibit G - Affidavit of EPL, #10 Exhibit H - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #11 Exhibit I - State Docket, #12 Exhibit J - Summons, #13 Exhibit K - Motion for Extension, #14 Exhibit L - Proposed Order re Motion for Extension, #15 Exhibit M - Order re Motion for Extension)(Lee, Evan) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less