This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2019 at 07:32:10 (UTC).

RUSSO v. ALLEGHENY COUNTY et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2018 RUSSO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ALLEGHENY COUNTY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark R. Hornak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01503

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark R. Hornak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEO RUSSO

Defendants

MONICA LONG

ALLEGHENY COUNTY

A' VIANDS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D. Aaron Rihn

Attorney at Robert Peirce & Associates, P.C.

707 Grant Street, Suite 2500

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorneys

John A. Bacharach

Attorney at Allegheny County Law Department

445 Fort Pitt Blvd. #300

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Elizabeth Farina Collura

Attorney at William J. Ferren & Associates

112 Washington Place, Suite 975 Two Chatham Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Daniel R. Bentz

Attorney at Marks, O'Neill, O'Brien, Doherty & Kelly

707 Grant Street, Suite 2600, Gulf Tower

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Jacob N. Holden

Attorney at Marks, O'Neill, O'Brien, Doherty & Kelly, P.C.

707 Grant Street, Suite 2600, Gulf Tower

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LEO RUSSO. A' VIANDS, LLC waiver sent on 11/13/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Rihn, D.) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob N. Holden on behalf of A' VIANDS, LLC. (Holden, Jacob) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Bentz on behalf of A' VIANDS, LLC. (Bentz, Daniel) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Bacharach on behalf of ALLEGHENY COUNTY. (Bacharach, John) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LEO RUSSO. ALLEGHENY COUNTY waiver sent on 11/13/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Rihn, D.) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Farina Collura on behalf of A' VIANDS, LLC. (Collura, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 11/16/18. (jad) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against A' VIANDS, LLC, ALLEGHENY COUNTY, MONICA LONG (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4927154), filed by LEO RUSSO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LEO RUSSO. A' VIANDS, LLC waiver sent on 11/13/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Rihn, D.) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob N. Holden on behalf of A' VIANDS, LLC. (Holden, Jacob) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Bentz on behalf of A' VIANDS, LLC. (Bentz, Daniel) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Bacharach on behalf of ALLEGHENY COUNTY. (Bacharach, John) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LEO RUSSO. ALLEGHENY COUNTY waiver sent on 11/13/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Rihn, D.) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Farina Collura on behalf of A' VIANDS, LLC. (Collura, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 11/16/18. (jad) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against A' VIANDS, LLC, ALLEGHENY COUNTY, MONICA LONG (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4927154), filed by LEO RUSSO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less