This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2017 at 02:44:26 (UTC).

RUSHIN v. POLK, et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2017 RUSHIN filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against POLK. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Stan Baker and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:17-CV-00145

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

R. Stan Baker

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RONALD EARLE RUSHIN

Grovetown, GA 30813

Defendants

Counselor Graham

SGT MCKINION

Dr. Polk

 

Court Documents

9 #2

notice with signature

9 #1

Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re: #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees)(slt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2017: #2 notice with signature) (slt). (Entered: 11/02/2017)

#8

(#8) NOTICE re: transfer of case from Middle District of Georgia. (slt) (Entered: 11/02/2017)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) Case transfer in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 5:17-cv-00290. Case transferred electronically (Entered: 11/02/2017)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, Waycross Division. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 11/2/2017. (tlh) (Entered: 11/02/2017)

#5

(#5) Mail Returned - #3 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, #4 Consent to Proceed Form Sent filed by RONALD EARLE RUSHIN sent to RONALD EARLE RUSHIN returned as undeliverable. Envelope marked "Refused Material". (ggs) (Entered: 08/08/2017)

#4

(#4) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to RONALD EARLE RUSHIN (ggs) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

#3

(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles H. Weigle issued at the direction of the Court. (ggs) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

2 #1

Trust Account Statement

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by RONALD EARLE RUSHIN. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(ggs) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

1 #1

Exhibit Health Services Request Form

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by RONALD EARLE RUSHIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Health Services Request Form)(ggs) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/1/2017) (ans). (Entered: 07/31/2017)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance with deficiency notice #9 due by 11/16/2017. (slt) (Entered: 11/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re: #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees)(slt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2017: #2 notice with signature) (slt). (Entered: 11/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE re: transfer of case from Middle District of Georgia. (slt) (Entered: 11/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Case transfer in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 5:17-cv-00290. Case transferred electronically (Entered: 11/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Southern District of Georgia, Waycross Division. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**(Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 11/16/2017.) (ggs) (Entered: 11/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, Waycross Division. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 11/2/2017. (tlh) (Entered: 11/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Mail Returned - #3 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, #4 Consent to Proceed Form Sent filed by RONALD EARLE RUSHIN sent to RONALD EARLE RUSHIN returned as undeliverable. Envelope marked "Refused Material". (ggs) (Entered: 08/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to RONALD EARLE RUSHIN (ggs) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles H. Weigle issued at the direction of the Court. (ggs) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by RONALD EARLE RUSHIN. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(ggs) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by RONALD EARLE RUSHIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Health Services Request Form)(ggs) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/1/2017) (ans). (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less