This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 15:08:04 (UTC).

Ruiz Vazquez v. MEMMEX, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 Ruiz Vazquez filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against MEMMEX, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Diane K. Vescovo and John T. Fowlkes, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02653

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

Presiding Judge

John T. Fowlkes, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rafael Ruiz Vazquez

Defendants

MEMMEX, INC.

David Parra

Cesar Parra

MEMMEX, INC. doing business as Salsa Cocina Mexican Restaurant

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bryce William Ashby

Attorney at DONATI LAW FIRM, LLP

1545 Union Ave.

Memphis, TN 38104

Janelle Crandall Osowski

Attorney at DONATI LAW FIRM, LLP

1545 Union Ave.

Memphis, TN 38104

William B. Ryan

Attorney at DONATI LAW FIRM, LLP

1545 Union Ave.

Memphis, TN 38104

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rafael Ruiz Vazquez as to MEMMEX, INC.. (Ashby, Bryce) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rafael Ruiz Vazquez as to David Parra. (Ashby, Bryce) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rafael Ruiz Vazquez as to Cesar Parra. (Ashby, Bryce) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Janelle Crandall Osowski on behalf of Rafael Ruiz Vazquez (Osowski, Janelle) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Ryan on behalf of Rafael Ruiz Vazquez (Ryan, William) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to David Parra. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Cesar Parra. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to MEMMEX, INC.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#2

(#2) Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

1 #4

Summons for David Parra

1 #3

Summons for Cesar Parra

1 #2

Summons for MEMMEX, Inc.

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT under the FLSA against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2886480), filed by Rafael Ruiz Vazquez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for MEMMEX, Inc., #3 Summons for Cesar Parra, #4 Summons for David Parra)(Ashby, Bryce) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rafael Ruiz Vazquez as to MEMMEX, INC.. (Ashby, Bryce) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rafael Ruiz Vazquez as to David Parra. (Ashby, Bryce) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rafael Ruiz Vazquez as to Cesar Parra. (Ashby, Bryce) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Janelle Crandall Osowski on behalf of Rafael Ruiz Vazquez (Osowski, Janelle) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Ryan on behalf of Rafael Ruiz Vazquez (Ryan, William) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to David Parra. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Cesar Parra. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to MEMMEX, INC.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT under the FLSA against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2886480), filed by Rafael Ruiz Vazquez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for MEMMEX, Inc., #3 Summons for Cesar Parra, #4 Summons for David Parra)(Ashby, Bryce) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less