This case was last updated from PACER on 12/24/2018 at 08:02:54 (UTC).

Ruiz v. Saad

Case Summary

On 10/25/2018 Ruiz filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Saad. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert W. Trumble and Gina M. Groh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00176

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert W. Trumble

Presiding Judge

Gina M. Groh

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ricardo Ruiz

Glenville, WV 26351

Respondent

Jennifer Saad

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Helen Campbell Altmeyer

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - Whg

Po Box 591

Wheeling, WV 26003

Christopher James Prezioso

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - Whg

Po Box 591

Wheeling, WV 26003

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF by Jennifer Saad re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR ALTERNATIVELY, FOR MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Prezioso, Christopher) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#10

(#10) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR ALTERNATIVELY, FOR, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jennifer Saad. (Prezioso, Christopher) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Prezioso on behalf of Jennifer Saad (Prezioso, Christopher) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#8

(#8) RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/21/2018. (cwm) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#7

(#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice (Other), #4 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/30/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

6 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#6

(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 11/16/2018. Copy mailed to pro se petitioner; copy mailed/emailed to AUSA Altmeyer. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#5

RESTRICTED

4 #2

Certified Mail Return Receipt

4 #1

Court-Approved Form

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachment: #1 Court-Approved Forms) Original notice and forms mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2018: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 10/25/2018)

3 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Original notice mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 10/25/2018)

2 #1

Attachment

#2

(#2) WRONG EVENT USED. NEF regenerated. (cwm) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

1 #1

Letter

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Jennifer Saad, filed by Ricardo Ruiz. (Attachments: #1 Letter, and #2 Envelope) Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims assigned. (cwm) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF by Jennifer Saad re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR ALTERNATIVELY, FOR MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Prezioso, Christopher) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR ALTERNATIVELY, FOR, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jennifer Saad. (Prezioso, Christopher) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Prezioso on behalf of Jennifer Saad (Prezioso, Christopher) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/21/2018. (cwm) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice (Other), #4 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/30/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 11/16/2018. Copy mailed to pro se petitioner; copy mailed/emailed to AUSA Altmeyer. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filing fee: $5.00 - receipt number WVNM001417. (cwm) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachment: #1 Court-Approved Forms) Original notice and forms mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2018: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Original notice mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) WRONG EVENT USED. NEF regenerated. (cwm) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Jennifer Saad, filed by Ricardo Ruiz. (Attachments: #1 Letter, and #2 Envelope) Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims assigned. (cwm) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.