This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2018 at 07:57:25 (UTC).

Ruekert & Mielke Inc v. Daniel

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Ruekert Mielke Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Daniel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy Joseph and J P Stadtmueller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01164

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Nancy Joseph

J P Stadtmueller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ruekert & Mielke, Inc.

Ruekert & Mielke Inc

Defendant

Scott Daniel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David G Hanson

Attorney at Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren SC

1000 N Water St - Ste 1700, Po Box 2965

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Heidi R Thole

Attorney at Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren SC

1000 N Water St - Ste 1700, Po Box 2965

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Daniel E Kattman

Attorney at Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren SC

1000 N Water St - Ste 1700, Po Box 2965

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Defendant Attorneys

Mark E Schmidt

Attorney at von Briesen & Roper SC

411 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 1000

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4427

Patrick M Bergin

Attorney at von Briesen & Roper SC

411 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 1000

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4427

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE Statement by Scott Daniel. (Schmidt, Mark)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 9/24/2018. (cc: all counsel)(jm)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Scott Daniel by Ruekert & Mielke, Inc.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2886093) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanson, David)

#10

(#10) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Ruekert & Mielke Inc. (Hanson, David)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ruekert & Mielke Inc. Scott Daniel served on 8/1/2018. (Hanson, David)

#7

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Ruekert & Mielke, Inc.. (Hanson, David)

1 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M Bergin on behalf of Scott Daniel. Attorney(s) appearing: Patrick M. Bergin (Bergin, Patrick)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Scott Daniel.(Bergin, Patrick)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeunesse Rutledge on behalf of Ruekert & Mielke Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeunesse Rutledge (Rutledge, Jeunesse)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeunesse Rutledge on behalf of Ruekert & Mielke Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeunesse Rutledge (Rutledge, Jeunesse)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Ruekert & Mielke Inc. (Hanson, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 9/24/2018. (cc: all counsel)(jm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Due to non-consent, this case has been randomly reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (blr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Ruekert & Mielke Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Hanson, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Scott Daniel. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Schmidt, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • FINAL NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed no later than September 14, 2018. The form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov. (blr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISCLOSURE Statement by Scott Daniel. (Schmidt, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed no later than September 6, 2018. The form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (blr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • NOTICE TO DEFENDANT- Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT; Scott Daniel requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Scott Daniel.(Bergin, Patrick)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M Bergin on behalf of Scott Daniel. Attorney(s) appearing: Patrick M. Bergin (Bergin, Patrick)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ruekert & Mielke Inc. Scott Daniel served on 8/1/2018. (Hanson, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (blr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Summons Issued as to Scott Daniel. (blr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Ruekert & Mielke, Inc.. (Hanson, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Scott Daniel by Ruekert & Mielke, Inc.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2886093) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanson, David)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.