Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 05:11:20 (UTC).

ROYSTER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC et al. v. BP EXPLORATION AND PRODUCTION INC et al.

Case Summary

On 04/19/2013 ROYSTER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against BP EXPLORATION AND PRODUCTION INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:13-CV-00245

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHNNY L MIMS

AARON YOUNG

EMORY CAREY

HARBERSON HOLDINGS INC

COMPLETE ANGLER SERVICE

MICHELE PROVENZANO

MOHAMMED MANNAN

ROBIN DANEKER

ALEJANDRO CAAL

BRENDA NEEL

KAYLA TAYLOR

EXPLORING TAMPA BAY

RONALD JONES

JOHN AUSTIN

LEVELT DURASSAINT

MARITZA GRANDA

STEPHEN CROOKS

MELVENE BROWN

LARRY WHITE

LINH YONG

4,292 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ERIC ALAN DIBERT

Attorney at MATTHEWS & JONES LLP - DESTIN FL

4475 Legendary Dr

Destin, FL 32541

BRENT WAYNE COON

Attorney at BRENT COON & ASSOCIATES PC

215 Orleans

Beaumont, TX 77701

DANA C MATTHEWS

Attorney at MATTHEWS & JONES LLP - DESTIN FL

4475 Legendary Dr

Destin, FL 32541

Other Attorneys

JENNY LANELL MARTINEZ

Attorney at GODWIN RONQUILLO PC - DALLAS TX

1201 Elm St, Ste 1700

Dallas, TX 75270

THOMAS ANDREW RANGE

Attorney at AKERMAN LLP - TALLAHASSEE FL

106 E College Ave Ste 1200

Tallahassee, FL 32301

FLOYD R HARTLEY, JR

Attorney at GODWIN RONQUILLO PC - DALLAS TX

1201 Elm St, Ste 1700

Dallas, TX 75270

JAMES ANDREW LANGAN

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP - CHICAGO IL

300 N Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

GAVIN EUGENE HILL

Attorney at GODWIN RONQUILLO PC - DALLAS TX

1201 Elm St, Ste 1700

Dallas, TX 75270

JAMES RILEY DAVIS

Attorney at AKERMAN SENTERFITT- TALLAHASSEE FL

106 E College Ave Ste 1200

Tallahassee, FL 32301

GINGER BARRY BOYD

Attorney at BROAD & CASSEL - DESTIN FL

4100 Legendard Drive Ste 280

Destin, FL 32550

MARK MONROE BARBER

Attorney at BROAD & CASSEL - TAMPA FL

100 N Tampa St - Ste 3500

Tampa, FL 33602

DONALD EVERETT GODWIN

Attorney at GODWIN RONQUILLO PC - DALLAS TX

1201 Elm St, Ste 1700

Dallas, TX 75270

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#9) Consent MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP CORPORATION NORTH AMERICA INC, BP EXPLORATION AND PRODUCTION INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (RANGE, THOMAS) (Entered: 05/21/2013)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MATTHEWS, DANA) (Entered: 04/19/2013)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of MINUTE ORDER TO INVOLVED JUDGES. Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-75) was filed on 5/1/2013 re: MDL 2179. (kvg) (Entered: 05/01/2013)

#4

(#5) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Thank you for your recent electronic filing with the Northern District of Florida. Unfortunately, document number #4 was filed using the wrong docket event. The "Summons Returned Executed" event was incorrectly used, rather "Notice (Other)" found under "Other Filings" would have been the more appropriate event. The clerk's office will correct the entry to match the document. No further action is required at this time. (kvg) (Entered: 05/01/2013)

#6

(#6) Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. (kvg) (Entered: 05/01/2013)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CTO-75 BY PLAINTIFFS by RENWICK ADDERLEY (MATTHEWS, DANA) (Entered: 05/08/2013)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROYSTER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC. TRANSOCEAN OFFSHORE DEEPWATER DRILLING INC served on 5/3/2013, answer due 5/24/2013. (MATTHEWS, DANA) (Entered: 05/10/2013)

9 #6

Exhibit F

9 #5

Exhibit E

9 #1

Exhibit A

#18

(#18) MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff Microspine, Inc. by ROYSTER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC. (MATTHEWS, DANA) (Entered: 06/06/2013)

#19

(#19) Amended MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff, Microspine, Inc. by ROYSTER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC. (MATTHEWS, DANA) (Entered: 06/06/2013)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by DANA C MATTHEWS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (MATTHEWS, DANA) (Entered: 06/14/2013)

#22

(#22) RULE 7.1(B) CONFERENCE STATEMENT re #19 Amended MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff, Microspine, Inc. by ROYSTER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC. (MATTHEWS, DANA) (Entered: 06/24/2013)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of MINUTE ORDER TO TRANSFEROR JUDGES/CLERKS. Transfer order was filed on 8/9/2013 re: MDL 2179. (kvg) (Entered: 08/13/2013)

25 #1

Request

#25

(#25) TRANSFER ORDER, certified copy with second email request from Clerk, Eastern District of Louisiana re: MDL 2179. (Attachments: #1 Request) (kvg) (Entered: 10/03/2013)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Interdistrict Transfer to the Eastern District of Louisiana, 500 Poydras Street, C-Room 151, New Orleans, LA 70130. Complaint, docket sheet and MDL Transfer Order sent via e-mail to oilspill_mdl_clerk@laed.uscourts.gov as requested per #25 . (kvg) (Entered: 10/03/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) TRANSFER ORDER, certified copy with second email request from Clerk, Eastern District of Louisiana re: MDL 2179. (Attachments: #1 Request) (kvg) (Entered: 10/03/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE of MINUTE ORDER TO TRANSFEROR JUDGES/CLERKS. Transfer order was filed on 8/9/2013 re: MDL 2179. (kvg) (Entered: 08/13/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER granting #19 Motion to Substitute Party. MICROSPINE terminated s/ M. Casey RodgersCHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on June 25, 2013. (amk) (Entered: 06/25/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #19 Amended MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff, Microspine, Inc., #22 Rule 7.1(B) Conference Statement. (pmc) (Entered: 06/24/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) RULE 7.1(B) CONFERENCE STATEMENT re #19 Amended MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff, Microspine, Inc. by ROYSTER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC. (MATTHEWS, DANA) (Entered: 06/24/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Appearance by DANA C MATTHEWS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (MATTHEWS, DANA) (Entered: 06/14/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #19 Amended MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff, Microspine, Inc. The motion was not accompanied by the required Rule 7.1(B) Conference Statement. Please file the statement accordingly making sure to link it to the event to which it relates by using the event "Rule 7.1B Conference Statement," found under "Other Filings," "Other Events." (pmc) (Entered: 06/07/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Amended MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff, Microspine, Inc. by ROYSTER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC. (MATTHEWS, DANA) (Entered: 06/06/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff Microspine, Inc. by ROYSTER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC. (MATTHEWS, DANA) (Entered: 06/06/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROYSTER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC. SPERRY DRILLING SERVICES served on 5/3/2013, answer due 5/24/2013. (MATTHEWS, DANA) (Entered: 05/21/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Consent MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP CORPORATION NORTH AMERICA INC, BP EXPLORATION AND PRODUCTION INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (RANGE, THOMAS) (Entered: 05/21/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROYSTER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC. TRANSOCEAN OFFSHORE DEEPWATER DRILLING INC served on 5/3/2013, answer due 5/24/2013. (MATTHEWS, DANA) (Entered: 05/10/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CTO-75 BY PLAINTIFFS by RENWICK ADDERLEY (MATTHEWS, DANA) (Entered: 05/08/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. (kvg) (Entered: 05/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Thank you for your recent electronic filing with the Northern District of Florida. Unfortunately, document number #4 was filed using the wrong docket event. The "Summons Returned Executed" event was incorrectly used, rather "Notice (Other)" found under "Other Filings" would have been the more appropriate event. The clerk's office will correct the entry to match the document. No further action is required at this time. (kvg) (Entered: 05/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS by ROYSTER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC as to All Defendants. (MATTHEWS, DANA) Modified on 5/1/2013 to correct title(kvg). (Entered: 05/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of MINUTE ORDER TO INVOLVED JUDGES. Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-75) was filed on 5/1/2013 re: MDL 2179. (kvg) (Entered: 05/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MATTHEWS, DANA) (Entered: 04/19/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1129-2615534.), filed by ROYSTER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (MATTHEWS, DANA) (Entered: 04/19/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS ANDREW RANGE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENNY LANELL MARTINEZ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARK MONROE BARBER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DONALD EVERETT GODWIN