This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/08/2018 at 07:01:19 (UTC).

Royal Printex, Inc. v. Zorian, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2018 Royal Printex, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Zorian, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gail J. Standish and Virginia A. Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-03894

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Royal Printex, Inc.

Defendants

Zorian, LLC

G-Stage Love.com, Inc.

TK Clothing Inc

DOES 1 through 10

TK Clothing Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott A Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Stephen M Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Trevor William Barrett

Attorney at Doninger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Justin M Gomes

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Royal Printex, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) without prejudice as to Zorian, LLC. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 06/18/2018)

#13

(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Royal Printex, Inc., upon Defendant G-Stage Love.com, Inc. served on 5/29/2018, answer due 6/19/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Steve Kim, Agent for Service c/o John Doe, Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 05/29/2018)

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Royal Printex, Inc., upon Defendant TK Clothing Inc. served on 5/29/2018, answer due 6/19/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Silvina Lee, Officer/Director c/o Richard Doe, Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 05/29/2018)

#11

(#11) STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) (Entered: 05/15/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 . Document number 7 due to clerical error. The wrong form for Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program was issued in error by the docket clerk. The updated form will be re-docket. (ghap) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants G-Stage Love.com, Inc., TK Clothing Inc., Zorian, LLC. (ghap) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Royal Printex, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 05/09/2018)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Royal Printex, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 05/09/2018)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Royal Printex, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 05/09/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Royal Printex, Inc., (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 05/09/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21727240 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Royal Printex, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Royal Printex, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 05/09/2018)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Royal Printex, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) without prejudice as to Zorian, LLC. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 06/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Royal Printex, Inc., upon Defendant G-Stage Love.com, Inc. served on 5/29/2018, answer due 6/19/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Steve Kim, Agent for Service c/o John Doe, Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 05/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Royal Printex, Inc., upon Defendant TK Clothing Inc. served on 5/29/2018, answer due 6/19/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Silvina Lee, Officer/Director c/o Richard Doe, Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 05/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) (Entered: 05/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 . Document number 7 due to clerical error. The wrong form for Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program was issued in error by the docket clerk. The updated form will be re-docket. (ghap) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants G-Stage Love.com, Inc., TK Clothing Inc., Zorian, LLC. (ghap) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Royal Printex, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 05/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Royal Printex, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 05/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Royal Printex, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 05/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Royal Printex, Inc., (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 05/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21727240 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Royal Printex, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Royal Printex, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 05/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TK Clothing Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where G-Stage Love.com, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where ROYAL PRINTEX INC.L is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trevor William Barrett