This case was last updated from PACER on 09/18/2018 at 07:33:49 (UTC).

Roy v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/20/2018 Roy filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Home Depot U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY and RICHARD L. PUGLISI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00279

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY

Referral Judge

RICHARD L. PUGLISI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Roy

Wilmington, NC 28403

Defendant

Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Adam C. Bach

Attorney at Eller Tonnsen Bach, LLC

1306 S. Church St.

Greenville, SC 29605

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/20/2018. Status Conference is set for 10/18/2018 09:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Charles Roy and Adam C. Bach, Esq. served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on July 20, 2018. (Entered: 07/20/2018)

16 #1

*Restricted*

#16

(#16) Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 7:17-cv-00239. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/20/2018)

#15

(#15) TRANSFER ORDER - Defendant's motion to dismiss for improper venue or in the alternative to transfer venue [DE 7] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Thisaction is hereby TRANSFERRED to the District of Hawaii. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/19/2018. Sent to Charles Roy via US Mail to 6316 S. Bradley Overlook, Wilmington, NC 28403. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 07/20/2018)

#14

(#14) RESPONSE regarding #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Bach, Adam) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 06/29/2018)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Charles Roy. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Objection to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certificate of Service) (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 06/22/2018)

7 #2

Certificate of Service

7 #1

Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#7

(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Charles Roy. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Objection to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certificate of Service) (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 06/22/2018)

6 #2

Envelope

#6

(#6) USPS Return Receipts - Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. served with summons and complaint on 12/27/2017 filed by Charles Roy. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#5

(#5) Civil Cover Sheet filed by Charles Roy. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/20/2017)

#4

(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Charles Roy. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/20/2017)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/14/2017)

#2

(#2) Notice of Self-Representation filed by Charles Roy. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/14/2017)

1 #2

Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bach, Adam) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 05/31/2018)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/20/2018. Status Conference is set for 10/18/2018 09:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Charles Roy and Adam C. Bach, Esq. served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on July 20, 2018. (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • (#18) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES: The Clerk of Court for the U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii gives notice of its receipt of the electronic case record for Civil Case 7:17-cv-00239-BO; Roy vs. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., transferred from the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina. Please be advised that this case has been assigned to Senior U.S. District Judge Susan Oki Mollway and U.S. Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi. Accordingly, please reflect case number CV 18-00279 SOM-RLP on all further filings in this case. Submission of Pro Hac Vice Applications: Counsel may refer to LR83.1(e) of the Local Rules for the District of Hawaii with respect to the submission of an application for pro hac vice admittance and the designation of local counsel (a member in good standing of the bar of this court who maintains an office within this district). The "Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Declaration of Counsel Package" (form HID007-007a) is available on the court's website, www.hid.uscourts.gov, see Forms Section (subsection "Miscellaneous"). The filing fee is $300.00 per attorney, per case. CM/ECF Registration: On January 1, 2014, this court implemented mandatory electronic filing, see LR100.2.1. The Local Rules for the District of Hawaii and information concerning CM/ECF registration are available on the court's website, www.hid.uscourts.gov. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Charles Roy and Adam C. Bach, Esq. served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on July 20, 2018. (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • (#17) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00279 SOM-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Charles Roy and Adam C. Bach, Esq. served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on July 20, 2018. (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 7:17-cv-00239. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) TRANSFER ORDER - Defendant's motion to dismiss for improper venue or in the alternative to transfer venue [DE 7] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Thisaction is hereby TRANSFERRED to the District of Hawaii. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/19/2018. Sent to Charles Roy via US Mail to 6316 S. Bradley Overlook, Wilmington, NC 28403. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Submitted to US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 07/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE regarding #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Bach, Adam) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 06/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Charles Roy. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Objection to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certificate of Service) (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 06/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Notice filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. regarding #10 Notice of Appearance . (Bach, Adam) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 06/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Financial Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bach, Adam) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 06/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Rule 12 Letter Issued to Charles Roy as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Response due by 6/25/2018. Copy sent to Charles Roy via US Mail to 6316 S. Bradley Overlook, Wilmington, NC 28403. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 06/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. Further, each attorney should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 06/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bach, Adam) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 05/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certificate of Service) (Bach, Adam) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 05/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) USPS Return Receipts - Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. served with summons and complaint on 12/27/2017 filed by Charles Roy. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Civil Cover Sheet filed by Charles Roy. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Charles Roy. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Self-Representation filed by Charles Roy. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number WIL001726), filed by Charles Roy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons) (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less