5:17-CV-00239
02/06/2017
Disposed - Other Disposed
Property - Eminent Domain
Sara Lioi
Rover Pipeline LLC
Gregory Shetler
Paul J. Kanney
Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA
Niese Brothers Farms
S & S Energy Corp.
Bethel Resources, Inc.
Lyndsey A. Stacklin
Unifund CCR, LLC
Patricia A. Foley
Farm Credit Mid-America, FLCA
Christ A. Miller
Solomon Klausner
Mandy Lynn Paramore
Daniel J. Hyzak
Michele L. Noble
Branden P. Moore
J. Andrew Crawford
Gregory W. Watts
Amanda J. Stacy-Hartman
Richard H. Glazer
Samuel H. Simon
James M. Wherley, Jr.
Kevin L. Colosimo
Craig R. Reynolds
Robert B. Preston, III
Leighann K. Fink
Jeremy M. Grayem
James Alex Quay
Nicholas J. Kopcho
Steven J. Shrock
Thomas A. Hill
Exhibit Conservation Easement
Docket(#780) Order of Dismissal and Closure of Case: This matter comes before the Court upon the joint motion of plaintiff and defendants Western Reserve Land Conservancy and The Vincent Goff, Jr. Living Trust dated February 6, 1996 to dismiss without prejudice all claims between them pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21. (Doc. No. #779 .) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21, the Court may, on a motion or on its own, dismiss any party at any time on just terms. The Court finds good cause and hereby GRANTS the parties' joint motion. Further, because all claims in this matter have been resolved, the Court directs the Clerk to close this case. Judge Sara Lioi on 10/7/2019. (D,N) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#779) Joint Motion to Dismiss all Claims and Counterclaims against One Another in the Underlying Matter filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC., Western Reserve Land Conservancy and The Vincent Goff, Jr. Living Trust (Brunton, Gregory) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
[-] Read LessDocketOrder: [non-document]: The Court hereby sets this matter for an in-person status conference on October 4, 2019 at 2:00 PM. Lead counsel for plaintiff, Western Reserve Land Conservancy, and The Vincent Goff, Jr. Living Trust, and all parties or party representatives with settlement authority, must be in attendance. Should the parties file the relevant stipulated dismissal entry prior to the conference, the Court will cancel the status conference. Counsel for Western Reserve Land Conservancy shall notify counsel for The Vincent Goff, Jr. Living Trust of the content of this non-document order. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/30/2019. (D,N) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#778) Joint Status Report of Rover Pipeline LLC and Western Reserve Land Conservancy filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brunton, Gregory) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
[-] Read LessDocketOrder [non-document]: Counsel for plaintiff and Western Reserve Conservancy shall by 12:00 PM on September 30, 2019 file either the stipulated dismissal for the last remaining issue in this case or file a joint status report advising the Court as to why the settlement has not been finalized. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/27/2019. (D,N) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
[-] Read LessDocketMinutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi: On September 5, 2019, the Court conducted a telephonic status conference. Attorneys Bruce Moore and Tom Zabel participated on behalf of Rover, Attorney Patrick Krebs participated on behalf of Western Reserve Conservancy, and Attorney Jamie Haren participated on behalf of property owner Vincent Goff. Counsel reported the parties have made significant strides toward settlement of this last unresolved property interest but had not reached a final resolution. After further discussions with counsel, a potential agreement was reached, subject to approval by clients. Counsel for Rover shall promptly advise the Court and all other interested parties as soon as Rover responds to the settlement.proposal. Should a settlement be reached, a final agreed dismissal entry, signed by all interested parties, shall be filed by September 20, 2019, after which the Court shall close this case. If a settlement is not reached, the Court will schedule the matter for a settlement conference. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 18 minutes. (D,N) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
[-] Read LessDocketMinutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi: On August 29, 2019, the Court conducted a telephonic status conference. Attorneys Greg Brunton and Tom Zabel participated on behalf of Rover, Attorney Patrick Krebs participated on behalf of Western Reserve Conservancy, and Attorney Jamie Haren participated on behalf of property owner Vincent Goff. Attorney Haren advised that she received the appraisal information, discussed it with her client, and submitted a settlement offer that is now under consideration. The Court will conduct a follow up telephonic conference with counsel, including Attorney Haren, on September 5, 2019 at 1:00 PM. Plaintiff's counsel shall place the call and contact the Court when all attorneys are on the line. In the interim, counsel are encouraged to continue settlement discussions. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 5 Minutes. (D,N) (Entered: 08/30/2019)
[-] Read LessDocketIMPORTANT: Notice [non-document]. The Telephone Conference set for 8/29/2019 is rescheduled to 03:00 PM before Judge Sara Lioi. The Telephone Conference will be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. After all counsel are on line, plaintiff's counsel is to place the call to the Chambers of the Honorable Sara Lioi at (330) 252-6060. (Change in time only) (D,N) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
[-] Read LessDocketMinutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi: On August 22, 2019, the Court conducted a telephonic status conference. Attorneys Bruce Moore and Greg Brunton participated on behalf of Rover, Attorney Patrick Krebs participated on behalf of Western Reserve Conservancy, and Attorney Jamie Haren participated on behalf of property owner Vincent Goff. Attorney Haren advised that she had been in contact with her client, his family, and counsel for Western Reserve and that information had been exchanged in anticipation of a possible resolution of this one remaining claim in the case. Counsel further indicated that the parties were working well together and that a resolution was likely. The Court will conduct a follow up telephonic conference with counsel, including Attorney Haren, on August 29, 2019 at 2:30 pm. Plaintiff's counsel shall place the call and contact the Court when all attorneys are on the line. In the interim, counsel are encouraged to continue settlement discussions and should contact chambers if the Court's assistance is required. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 10 minutes. (D,N) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
[-] Read LessDocketMinutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi: On August 16, 2019, the Court conducted a status conference. Attorneys Gregory Brunton and Patrick Krebs, Rover's representative, Trey Flournoy, and Western Reserve Land Conservancy's representative, Robert Owen, were in attendance. The Court discussed with counsel and the party representatives resolution of the remaining interest in this case. Counsel advised that Western Reserve's interest was tied to that of property owner Vincent Goff's, and that resolution would likely require the participation of Mr. Goff and, if he is still represented by her, his attorney, Jamie Haren. Accordingly, the Court set the matter for a telephonic conference with counsel, including Attorney Haren, on August 22, 2019 at 3:00 PM. Attorney Krebs is instructed to advise Attorney Haren of her obligation to participate in the phone conference. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 45 minutes. (D,N) (Entered: 08/18/2019)
[-] Read LessDocketParty John S. McClaren, Jr., Sharon R. McClaren, Cardinal Gas Services, LLC, Ronnie Lee Shockley, Bonnie Sue Shockley, Michael A. Bostic, Cindy G. Bostic, Eric Petroleum Corporation, Jamestown Resources, LLC, Pelican Energy, LLC, John C. Meyer, Sharon L. Meyer, Brownlee Land Ventures, LP, Noble Marcellus, LP and Consumers National Bank added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
[-] Read LessDocketParty Dover-Atwood 1994 Limited Partnership, E.C.O Production, LLC, Capital C Energy Operations, LP, Artex Energy Group, LLC, L & M Associates, Inc., SOPUS Products, Sierra Buckeye, LLC, Earl C. Sheehan, Trustee, Carl D. Miller, III, Sherry L. Miller, Dominion East Ohio, Range Resources-Appalachia, LLC, Enervest Energy Institutional Fund IX-A, LP, Enterprise Gas and Oil Incorporated, First Federal Community Bank, Dorothy Somers Clarke and George E. Frey added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
[-] Read LessDocketParty Roger W. Spellman, Karen Spellman, Gorden L. Hughes, Christina S. Hughes, Lesa L. Harper, Tracy D. Harper, James R. Wolfe, Kathy A. Wolfe, Patrick G. Weaver, Renee L. Weaver, The East Ohio Gas Company, Enterprise Energy Corporation, Belden & Blake, LLC, Petrox, Inc., Quaker State Oil Refining Corporation, Sound Energy Company, Inc., CHK Utica, LLC, Chesapeake AEC Acquisition, LLC, Chesapeake Exploration, LLC, Total E&P USA, Inc., Enervest Energy Institutional Fund IX, LP, Enervest Energy Institutional Fund IX-WI, LP, CGas Properties, LP, Leesville Land, LLC, John M. Fiocca, Cravat Coal Company, Blue Racer Midstream, LLC, Carroll Electric Cooperative, Marathon Pipeline, LLC and Quaker State Oil Refining added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
[-] Read LessDocketParty John C. Kamenik, Angela M. Kamenik, Spelman Pipeline Holdings, LLC, Northeast Ohio Natural Gas Corp., AG Credit, Agricultural Credit Association, Teresa A. Young, Searl Dean Allen, Rebecca Sue Allen, David E. Harpster, Anita L. Harpster, Lonnie D. Workman, Lonnie D. Workman (First American RE Tax), Melissa K. Heslep, Melissa Heslep (Wells Fargo RE Tax), First America Re Tax, Wells Fargo Re Tax Serv, Howard D. Miller, Kendra G. Miller, Phillip R. Harlan, Shari A. Harlan, Paul J. Kaufman, AT & T Corp., Roger W. Spellman, Jr. and Ronald J. Spellman added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
[-] Read LessDocketParty Kamenik Real Estate, LLC, AT&T Wireless PCS Inc., American Towers, Inc., The Anderson Group of Companies, Inc., L & K Rentals of Ashland, LLC, Jim Pittenger, Angie E. Pittenger, Keith S. Dohner, Trustee of the Dohner Family Irrevocable Trust, Karen L. Dohner, Trustee of Dohner Family Irrevocable Trust, Keith Dohner (First American RE Tax), Debra Dohner (First American RE Tax), Keith Dohner and Debra Dohner added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
[-] Read LessDocketParty Earl F. Arnholt, Cynthia H. Arnholt, NiSource Corporate Services Company, Farmers and Savings Bank, Division of the Park National Bank, Wayne Bright, Bucyrus Community Hospital and Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
[-] Read LessDocketParty Jerry D. Cline, Linda K. Cline, Steven R. Smith, Kelly J. Smith, Park National Bank, The Standard Oil Company, Sohio Gas Pipeline Company, FirstMerit Mortgage Corporation, Denny J. Smith, Trustee of the Denny J. Smith Revocable Trust dated 03-18-09, Jill Galbraith, Successor Trustee of the Stull Family Trust dated April 2, 2010, Sutton Bank and Columbia Pipeline Group, Inc. added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
[-] Read LessDocketParty Bryan Bodager, Co-Trustee of the Dale E. Bodager and Clara L. Bodager Revocable Trust Agreements dated February 7, 1997, Ronnie Bodager, Co-Trustee of the Dale E. Bodager and Clara L. Bodager Revocable Trust Agreements dated February 7, 1997, Duane Bodager, Co-Trustee of the Dale E. Bodager and Clara L. Bodager Revocable Trust Agreements dated February 7, 1997, Aspire Energy of Ohio, LLC, Firelands Electric Cooperative, Inc., Columbia Gas of Ohio, Inc., Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC, Carter M. Hanna, Mary Elizabeth Wise, Stanley W. Wise, Linda M. Kyser, Verizon North, Inc., NiSource Corporate Services Company aka NiSource Energy Ventures, LLC, Greg McNaull Real Estate, LLC, McNaull Real Estate, LLC and Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA aka Farm Credit Mid-America, FLCA added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
[-] Read LessDocketParty Michael J. Sloan, Trustee of the Sloan Revocable Living Trust dated September 30, 2007, Donna M. Sloan, Trustee of the Sloan Revocable Living Trust dated September 30, 2007, Michael J. Sloan, Individually, Donna M. Sloan, Individually, The Ohio Bell Telephone Company, Bethel Resources, Inc., The Farmers Savings Bank, The Park National Bank, M & R Investments Ohio, LLC, Herbert L. Gray, AB Resources OH, LLC, Diversified Resources, Inc., Cliff Falk, Geraldine Falk, Max D. Fulk, Trustee of the Max and Karla Fulk Revocable Living Trust dated January 29, 2010 and Karla S. Fulk, Trustee of the Max and Karla Fulk Revocable Living Trust dated January 29, 2010 added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
[-] Read LessDocketParty Ohio Edison Company, William L. Jones, Dixie A. Jones, Robert E. Farquhar, Cynthia A. Farquhar, Daniel E. Sheaffer, Mandy Lynn Paramore, James C. Sheaffer, Stella Sheaffer, Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA, Kenoil Producing, LLC and Rimco Operating, Inc. added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
[-] Read Less