This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2019 at 07:04:45 (UTC).

Rousseau et al v. RI Party Boat, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2018 Rousseau filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against RI Party Boat, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00629

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Emily Rousseau

Joseph Rousseau

Defendants

James Rosenthal

RI Party Boat, LLC

Aaron Meredith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John K. Fulweiler

Attorney at Fulweiler LLC

W.B. Franklin Bakery Building, 40 Mary Street, First Floor - Aft

Newport, RI 02840

Defendant Attorney

Seth S. Holbrook

Attorney at Holbrook & Murphy

238 Lewis Wharf

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Seth S. Holbrook on behalf of All Defendants (Holbrook, Seth) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Rousseau, Joseph Rousseau. Aaron Meredith served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. (Fulweiler, John) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Rousseau, Joseph Rousseau. James Rosenthal served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (Fulweiler, John) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Rousseau, Joseph Rousseau. RI Party Boat, LLC served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (Fulweiler, John) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Aaron Meredith, RI Party Boat, LLC, James Rosenthal. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#2

(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

1 #5

Summons - James Rosenthal

1 #4

Summons - Aaron Meredith

1 #3

Summons - RI Party Boat, LLC

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit "A" (Vessel's Abstract of Title)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1288841 ), filed by Emily Rousseau, Joseph Rousseau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" (Vessel's Abstract of Title), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - RI Party Boat, LLC, #4 Summons - Aaron Meredith, #5 Summons - James Rosenthal)(Fulweiler, John) (Entered: 11/18/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Seth S. Holbrook on behalf of All Defendants (Holbrook, Seth) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Rousseau, Joseph Rousseau. Aaron Meredith served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. (Fulweiler, John) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Rousseau, Joseph Rousseau. James Rosenthal served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (Fulweiler, John) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Rousseau, Joseph Rousseau. RI Party Boat, LLC served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (Fulweiler, John) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Aaron Meredith, RI Party Boat, LLC, James Rosenthal. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1288841 ), filed by Emily Rousseau, Joseph Rousseau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" (Vessel's Abstract of Title), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - RI Party Boat, LLC, #4 Summons - Aaron Meredith, #5 Summons - James Rosenthal)(Fulweiler, John) (Entered: 11/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1288841 ), filed by Emily Rousseau, Joseph Rousseau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" (Vessel's Abstract of Title), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - RI Party Boat, LLC, #4 Summons - Aaron Meredith, #5 Summons - James Rosenthal)(Fulweiler, John) (Entered: 11/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less