This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/16/2018 at 05:54:46 (UTC).

Roudabush v. Graham et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 Roudabush filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Graham. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bruce Howe Hendricks and Jacquelyn D Austin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-01599

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bruce Howe Hendricks

Referral Judge

Jacquelyn D Austin

 

Party Details

Defendants

Bassel

Davis

Correctional Officer Siri

Lt Young

Correctional Officer Mackenberg

Correctional Officer Goodyear

Lindsey Graham

Assoc Warden Vereen

Lt Robertson

Lt Blackwelder

Lt Strickland

Capt James

Correctional Officer Zaning

Regional Director SERO

Warden Antonelli

F Brockington

Correctional Officer Robinson

Dr Blocker

Director DSCC-F-BOP

Correctional Officer Hall

19 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Attachment III-Claims

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Attachment I), filed by James L Roudabush, Jr. Service due by 9/6/2018 (Attachments: #1 Attachment III-Claims, #2 Envelope) (gpre, ) Note: "Attachment II" not received. (Entered: 06/14/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Attachment I), filed by James L Roudabush, Jr. Service due by 9/6/2018 (Attachments: #1 Attachment III-Claims, #2 Envelope) (gpre, ) Note: "Attachment II" not received. (Entered: 06/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLOCKER AS TRUSTEE OF THE CLEVELAND ALVIN BLOCKER AND CAROLY JEAN BLOCKER REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST DATED APRIL 15 2008, CLEVELAND A is a litigant

Latest cases where DAVIS(D) is a litigant